IN RE BROCADE COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS, INC. DERIVATIVE LITIGATION

Case Number: 3:2005cv02233
Filed: June 1, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 3, 2010 469 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF REMAINING CLAIMS AGAINST GREGORY REYES PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT re 468 Stipulation filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/2/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2010)
October 30, 2009 462 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT re Dismissal of Remaining Claims against Neal Dempsey and Seth Neiman and their prospective counterclaimes re 460 Stipulation, filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/29/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2009) Modified on 11/2/2009 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
July 17, 2009 453 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Approving Settlement and Entry of Complete Bar Order as to Seth D. Neiman re 443 MOTION for Settlement.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/16/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2009)
April 14, 2009 441 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: Dismissal of remaining claims against defendant Antonio Canova re 440 Stipulation filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/13/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2009)
March 26, 2009 437 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Dismissal of remaining claim against defendant Robert D. Bossi re 436 Stipulation filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/25/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2009)
February 13, 2009 412 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Extending Deadline to Respond re 411 Stipulation filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. Signed by Judge Charles on 2/12/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2009)
February 3, 2009 392 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER extending time to file third-party complaint without obtaining leave by motion re 390 Stipulation filed by Gregory L. Reyes. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/3/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2009)
January 28, 2009 388 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER extending time to respond to complaint re 384 Stipulation filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/28/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2009)
January 16, 2009 382 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED SCHEDULING ORDER re 381 Stipulation filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/16/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2009)
January 7, 2009 378 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER extending time limit to answer second amended complaint re 376 Stipulation filed by Seth D. Neiman. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/6/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2009)
January 6, 2009 377 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Breyer granting 299 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 303 Motion to Dismiss; granting 304 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 308 Motion to Dismiss; granting 312 Motion to Dismiss; gr anting in part and denying in part 313 Motion to Dismiss; granting 320 Motion to Dismiss; granting 323 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 326 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 329 Motion to Dismiss (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2009)
December 12, 2008 375 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER memorandum on motions to dismiss (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2008)
October 2, 2008 284 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Amending Second Amended Complaint by Dismissing Two Causes of Action as to Defendants Neal Dempsey and Seth D. Neiman re 282 Stipulation filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/01/08. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN RE BROCADE COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS, INC. DERIVATIVE LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?