Cornelia I. Crowell GST Trust v. Magma Design Automation, Inc. et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv02394
Filed: June 13, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Referring Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 10, 2009 214 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: Declaration (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2009)
September 12, 2008 200 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ***Civil Case Terminated.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/11/08. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2008)
July 1, 2005 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding scheduling and related matters re 7 Received Order filed by Magma Design Automation, Inc.,, Rajeev Madhavan,, Gregory C. Walker,, Roy E. Jewell,, Consolidation of Related Cases; C-05-2394 shall constitute the master docket and sh all bear the following caption In re MAGMA DESIGN AUTOMATION, INC. SECURITIES LITIGATION. This order shall apply to every such related action, absent order of the Court.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/30/05. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2005)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cornelia I. Crowell GST Trust v. Magma Design Automation, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?