Haynes et al v. Anna's Linens Company et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv02670
Filed: June 29, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Referring Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 20, 2009 188 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS' STATUS REPORT REGARDING MAILING OF NOTICE OF DISMISSAL. Plaintiffs are not required to take any further action with respect to providing notice. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 20, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2009)
March 26, 2009 186 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 26, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2009)
March 19, 2009 183 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST TO FILE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT UNDER SEAL; SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO DISMISS; VACATING MAY 1, 2009 HEARING; VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Plaintiffs' request that they be permitted to file under seal a copy of the Confidential Settlement Agreement and Release is granted; plaintiffs shall file said copy no later than March 26, 2009. No later than March 26, 2009, defendant shall file an opposition or statement of non-o pposition to the motion to dismiss. Any reply shall be filed no later than March 31, 2009 at 4:00 p.m. The May 1, 2009 hearing is vacated. The Case Management Conference scheduled for March 27, 2009 is vacated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 19, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
March 5, 2009 179 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE. The Status Conference is continued from March 6, 2009 to March 27, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 5, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2009)
January 26, 2009 176 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE. The Status Conference is continued from January 30, 2009 to March 6, 2009. A Joint Status Conference Statement shall be filed no later than February 27, 2009. Should plaintiffs file a motion to dismiss prior to March 6, 2009, the March 6, 2009 Status Conference shall stand vacated without further order of the court. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 26, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2009)
December 15, 2008 174 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. The Status Conference is continued from December 19, 2008 to January 30, 2009. A Joint Status Report shall be filed no later than January 23, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 15, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2008)
November 17, 2008 172 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT. The Case Management Conference is continued from November 21, 2008 to December 19, 2008. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 17, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2008)
September 2, 2008 168 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE. The Status Conference is continued from September 5, 2008 to September 26, 2008. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 2, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haynes et al v. Anna's Linens Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?