Washington v. Duncan et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv02775
Filed: July 6, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 3, 2012 100 Opinion or Order of the Court WRIT of habeas corpus ad testificandum issued for presence of plaintiff at settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 02/03/2012. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2012)
January 5, 2012 97 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nandor Vadas for Mediation Settlement: ORDER LIFTING STAY. Discovery due by 10/31/2012. Jury Trial set for 2/4/2013 07:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco befo re Hon. William Alsup. Motions due by 12/13/2012. Pretrial Conference set for 1/28/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/5/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2012)
November 9, 2011 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge William Alsup denying 82 Motion for Immediate Injunctive Relief. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2011)
November 8, 2011 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 91 Stipulation filed by Tracye B. Washington. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 8, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2011)
November 3, 2011 85 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/6/11. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington v. Duncan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?