Hopkins v. Bonvicino et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv02932
Filed: July 19, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 1, 2011 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTTING 143 Stipulation OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/1/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2011)
July 6, 2011 141 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER OF REFERRAL RE: SETTLEMENT DISPUTE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/6/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
June 16, 2011 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Requiring Status Report re Settlement. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on June 16, 2011. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
April 15, 2011 137 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 136 Notice of Settlement and Request to Vacate Trial Date. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/15/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2011)
April 12, 2011 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 130 PERMISSION TO ENTER COURTHOUSE WITH AUDIO/VISUAL EQUIPMENT FOR TRIAL. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 4/12/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2011)
March 25, 2011 119 Opinion or Order of the Court COURT'S INTENDED VOIR DIRE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on March 25, 2011. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2011)
March 21, 2011 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Defendants' Request for Reconsideration and Denying Plaintiff's Request for Bifurcation. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on March 21, 2011. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2011)
October 12, 2010 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting re 84 Stipulation Re Continuance of Settlement Conference filed by City of San Carlos, Buelow, Nick Nguyen, A. Bonvicino. Signed by Judge James Larson on 10/12/10. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2010)
September 17, 2010 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 69 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2010)
September 14, 2010 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING re 69 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Bruce Hopkins. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 09/14/10. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2010)
August 5, 2010 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE 69 on Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 5, 2010. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2010)
April 29, 2010 65 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER 63 Granting Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Conference shall be heard at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on April 29, 2010. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2010)
October 28, 2009 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 56 Stipulation to Stay. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on October 28, 2009. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2009)
October 6, 2009 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Modified 53 Stipulation to Continue Status Conference. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on October 6, 2009. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2009)
April 3, 2009 44 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND ORDER Requiring Joint Status Report Status Report due by 4/10/2009 and every 180 days thereafter until the appeal is resolved and the stay is lifted. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/3/09. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hopkins v. Bonvicino et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?