Knapps v. City of Oakland et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv02935
Filed: July 19, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 15, 2009 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO FILE MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES re 107 Stipulation filed by Uganda Knapps. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/15/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2009)
September 18, 2009 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE ATTORNEY'S FEES MOTION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/18/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2009)
September 8, 2009 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART & DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO ALTER JUDGMENT; ORDER VACATING HEARING re 93 Notice (Other) filed by City of Oakland. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/8/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2009)
August 3, 2009 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/3/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2009)
July 20, 2009 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUESTING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/20/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2009)
March 3, 2009 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Requesting Transcript of October 23, 2007. Signed by Judge HON. MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 3/3/09. (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knapps v. City of Oakland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?