Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada (U.S.) v. Stevens et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv03034
Filed: July 26, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Martin J. Jenkins
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 2, 2005 24 Featured Case ORDER granting 23 Proposed Order (1) Appointing Guardian Ad Litem for Minor Defendant; (2) Approving Disclaimer in Interest in Interpled Funds; (3) Discharging Plaintiff-in-Interpleader Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada (U.S.) and Awarding Attorneys Fees and Costs; (4) Disbursing Remaining Interpled Funds to Estate of Anthony Walker; and (5) Dismissing Action with Prejudice by Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada (U.S.)., filed by Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada (U.S.),. Signed by Judge Martin J. Jenkins on 11/29/2005. (mat, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2005)
November 16, 2005 23 Proposed Order (1) Appointing Guardian Ad Litem for Minor Defendant; (2) Approving Disclaimer in Interest in Interpled Funds; (3) Discharging Plaintiff-in-Interpleader Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada (U.S.) and Awarding Attorneys Fees and Costs; (4) Disbursing Remaining Interpled Funds to Estate of Anthony Walker; and (5) Dismissing Action with Prejudice by Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada (U.S.). (Ostroff, Jamie) (Filed on 11/16/2005)
November 3, 2005 22 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Martin J. Jenkins Appointing Guardian Ad Litem for Minor Defendant; Approving Disclaimer in Interest in Interpled Funds; Discharging Plaintiff-in-Interpleader Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada (U.S.) and Awarding Attorneys Fees and; DISMISSING ACTION with prejudice (filed UNDER SEAL). (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2005)
November 3, 2005 21 Declaration of Heather Lenore Dunn in Support of 20 Stipulation (filed UNDER SEAL) filed bySun Life Assurance Company of Canada (U.S.). (Related document(s) 20 ) (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2005)
November 3, 2005 20 STIPULATION for (1) Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Minor Defendant; {2) Approval of Disclaimer in Interest in Interpled Funds; (3) Discharge of Plaintiff-in-Interpleader Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada (U.S.) and Award of Attorneys Fees and Costs; (4) Disbursement of Remaing Interplead Funds to Estate of Anthony Walker; and (5) Dismisal of Action With Prejudice (filed UNDER SEAL) by Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada (U.S.), Lionel C. Stevens, Heather Lenore Dunn, California Department of Child Support Services. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2005)
November 3, 2005 19 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Martin J. Jenkins granting 15 Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal. (mat, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2005)
October 20, 2005 18 CLERK'S NOTICE re: Failure to E-File and/or Failure to Register as an E-Filer re: 15 , 16 , 17 . (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2005)
October 19, 2005 17 Declaration of Heather Lenore Dunn in Support of 16 Stipulation filed bySun Life Assurance Company of Canada (U.S.). (Related document(s) 16 ) (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2005)
October 19, 2005 16 STIPULATION for (1) Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Minor Defendant; {2) Approval of Disclaimer in Interest in Interpled Funds; (3) Discharge of Plaintiff-in-Interpleader Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada (U.S.) and Award of Attorneys Fees and Costs; (4) Disbursement of Remaing Interplead Funds to Estate of Anthony Walker; and (5) Dismisal of Action With Prejudice filed by Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada (U.S.), Lionel C. Stevens, Heather Lenore Dunn, California Department of Child Support Services. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2005)
October 19, 2005 15 ADMINSTRATIVE MOTION to File Documents Under Seal filed by Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada (U.S.). (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2005)
October 19, 2005 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada (U.S.) Amended Proof of Service on Defendant-in-Interpleader California Department of Child Support Services (Ostroff, Jamie) (Filed on 10/19/2005)
October 19, 2005 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada (U.S.) of First Amended Complaint-in-Interpleader (Ostroff, Jamie) (Filed on 10/19/2005)
August 25, 2005 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada (U.S.) OF PROOFS OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT-IN-INTERPLEADER (Ostroff, Jamie) (Filed on 8/25/2005)
August 24, 2005 11 CLERK'S NOTICE [Reassigned Case]. Case Management Conference set for 11/29/2005 02:00 PM. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/21/2005. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order) (mat, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2005)
August 23, 2005 10 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Martin J. Jenkins for all further proceedings. Judge Bernard Zimmerman no longer assigned to case. Signed by EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE on 8/23/05. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2005)
August 22, 2005 9 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2005)
August 19, 2005 8 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada (U.S.) and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge. (Ostroff, Jamie) (Filed on 8/19/2005)
August 19, 2005 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT -IN-INTERPLEADER against all defendants. Filed bySun Life Assurance Company of Canada (U.S.). (Ostroff, Jamie) (Filed on 8/19/2005)
August 17, 2005 6 NOTICE of Deposit of Funds Into Court Registry in the amount of $115,204.27, Receipt No. 3375574. Filed by Plaintiff-in-Interpleader Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada (U.S.) re 4 Order. [EXHIBIT A - Sealed Document]. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2005) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/19/2005 (tn, COURT STAFF).
August 16, 2005 5 Featured Case ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 8/10/2005. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2005)
August 3, 2005 4 Featured Case [FILED UNDER SEAL]....ORDER DIRECTING DEPOSIT OF STAKE INTO COURT REGISTRY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 8/3/2005. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2005) Modified on 8/18/2005 (tn, COURT STAFF). Additional attachment(s) added on 8/19/2005 (tn, COURT STAFF).
July 26, 2005 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (tn, COURT STAFF)
July 26, 2005 RECEIVED ORDER: [Proposed] Order Directing Deposit of Stake Into Court Registry Submitted by Plaintiff Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada (U.S.). (tn, COURT STAFF)
July 26, 2005 3 [FILED UNDER SEAL]....CERTIFICATION of Interested Parties or Persons Filed by Plaintiff Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada (U.S.). (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2005) Modified on 8/18/2005 (tn, COURT STAFF).
July 26, 2005 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due 11/21/2005 & Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/28/2005 04:00 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order).(tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2005)
July 26, 2005 SUMMONS Issued as to Heather Lenore Dunn. (tn, COURT STAFF)
July 26, 2005 SUMMONS Issued as to J.M.F., a Minor, by Heather Lenore Dunn, his Guardian ad Litem. (tn, COURT STAFF)
July 26, 2005 SUMMONS Issued as to California Department of Child Support Services. (tn, COURT STAFF)
July 26, 2005 SUMMONS Issued as to Lionel C. Stevens. (tn, COURT STAFF)
July 26, 2005 1 [FILED UNDER SEAL]....COMPLAINT-IN-INTERPLEADER - [Summons Issued] against Lionel C. Stevens, J.M.F., Heather Lenore Dunn & California Department of Child Support Services, [Filing Fee: $250.00, Receipt Number 3374844]. Filed by Plaintiff Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada (U.S.). (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2005) Modified on 8/18/2005 (tn, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada (U.S.) v. Stevens et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?