Solis v. Regis Corporation, The

Case Number: 3:2005cv03039
Filed: July 27, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Referring Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 13, 2009 275 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 274 Motion for preliminary approval without prejudice. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2009)
September 18, 2008 269 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 268 Stipulation filed by Regis Corporation, The Further Case Management Conference set for 10/17/2008 08:30 AM.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/18/08. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2008)
September 12, 2008 267 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/11/08. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Solis v. Regis Corporation, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?