Oracle USA, Inc. v. Smithfield Foods, Inc.

Case Number: 3:2005cv03044
Filed: July 27, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 16, 2005 12 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Defendant's Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to 8/22/05. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 8/16/05. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2005)
August 4, 2005 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Jeffrey S. White recused.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/3/05. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2005)
August 1, 2005 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCONTINUING SERVICE BY MAIL. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/1/05. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2005)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oracle USA, Inc. v. Smithfield Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?