Edwards v. Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.

Case Number: 3:2005cv03076
Filed: July 28, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 31, 2011 125 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 8/31/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2011)
July 19, 2011 121 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT & AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 7/19/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2011)
May 24, 2011 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO APPEAR BY PHONE AT STATUS CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 5/24/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2011)
April 18, 2011 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 4/18/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2011)
April 7, 2011 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING DISCOVERY CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 4/7/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2011)
March 21, 2011 106 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Cancelling Further Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 03/21/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2011)
February 7, 2011 103 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 2/7/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2011)
December 1, 2010 98 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 12/1/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2010)
November 1, 2010 96 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE LAPORTE FOR A JUDICIAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 11/1/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2010) Modified on 11/1/2010 (bzsec, COURT STAFF).
May 11, 2010 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING JURY TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 5/11/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?