Universal Paragon Corporation et al v. Ingersoll-Rand Company et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv03100
Filed: July 29, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Martin J. Jenkins
Referring Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:6901 Environmental Cleanup Expenses
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 15, 2011 305 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/14/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2011)
June 10, 2010 296 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER continuing the Case Management Conference to 9/20/2010 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/10/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2010)
April 21, 2010 294 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER continuing the Case Management Conference to 6/14/2010 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/20/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2010)
September 16, 2009 290 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER continuing the Further Case Management Conference to 12/14/2009 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/15/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2009)
July 8, 2009 288 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER continuing the Case Management Conference to 9/21/2009 at 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 07/08/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2009)
February 26, 2009 286 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER continuing the Case Management Conference to 7/13/2009 at 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/26/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2009)
November 21, 2008 284 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER to continue the Case Management Conference to 3/2/2009 at 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/20/08. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Universal Paragon Corporation et al v. Ingersoll-Rand Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?