Foster et al v. City Of Oakland et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv03110
Filed: August 1, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Marilyn H. Patel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 28, 2010 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 118 Motion to Substitute Party Estate of Darnell Foster for plaintiff Darnell Foster (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2010)
January 14, 2010 105 Opinion or Order of the Court USCA ORDER (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2010)
January 5, 2010 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF CLARIFICATION re Appeal 09-74059; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 1/4/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2010)
November 12, 2009 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL: Attorney John Jeffrey Verber for City Of Oakland added for defendants City of Oakland, Sean Festag; Attorney Arlene Marcia Rosen terminated; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 11/12/2009. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foster et al v. City Of Oakland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?