Carr v. Liberty Life Assurance Company et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv03190
Filed: August 5, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 29, 2009 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting 56 Defendant's Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award and denying 78 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2009)
October 23, 2008 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER filing document under seal. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/23/08. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2008)
August 17, 2005 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting 3 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Re: Steve P. Krafchick) (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2005)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carr v. Liberty Life Assurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?