G.C. & K.B. Investments, Inc. et al v. Zenon Komarczyk

Case Number: 3:2005cv03333
Filed: August 16, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Referring Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 10, 2009 245 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 7/10/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2009)
January 23, 2009 239 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 1/23/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2009)
January 14, 2009 236 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE ZIMMERMAN UPON CONSENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 14, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2009)
December 15, 2008 233 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference scheduled for December 19, 2008 is hereby VACATED. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 15, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2008)
November 25, 2008 230 Opinion or Order of the Court RELATED CASE ORDER. G.C. & K.B. Investments, Inc., et al. v. Komarczyk, et al., C 08-4880 PVT, is related to G.C. & K.B. Investments, Inc., et al. v. Komarczyk, C 05-3333 MMC. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 25, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2008)
October 3, 2008 221 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 3, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 1, 2008 220 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO LODGE CHAMBERS COPIES IN COMPLIANCE WITH GENERAL ORDER 45 AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 1, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2008)
September 17, 2008 217 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 9/17/2008. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: G.C. & K.B. Investments, Inc. et al v. Zenon Komarczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?