People of the States of California et al v. United States Department of Agriculture, et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv03508
Filed: August 30, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:4321 Review of Agency Action-Environment
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 1, 2010 295 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER on Attorneys' Fees & Costs re 294 Stipulation Signed by Mag. Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 2/1/2010. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2010)
December 17, 2009 293 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 12/17/2009 to Stay Briefing & Submission of Additional Materials Re Application for Attorney's Fees & Expenses re 292 Stipulation. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2009)
December 2, 2008 283 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER PARTIALLY STAYING INJUNCTIVE RELIEF IN THE INTERESTS OF COMITY PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 62(c) by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting in part and denying in part 257 Motion ; denying 260 Motion to Stay (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: People of the States of California et al v. United States Department of Agriculture, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?