Inherent.Com v. Martindale-Hubbell et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Inherent.Com
Defendant: Lexis/Nexis Inc. and Martindale-Hubbell
Case Number: 3:2005cv03515
Filed: August 30, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Marilyn H. Patel
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 28, 2006 34
Acknowledgement Receipt from USDC for the District of New Jersey of transferred case. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2006)
March 15, 2006 33
Certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet along with the original case file sent to USDC for the District of New Jersey. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2006)
March 10, 2006 32 Opinion or Order of the Court
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel DENYING 6 defendant's Motion to Dismiss and GRANTING defendant's motion to transfer; Clerk shall transfer the file in this action to the USDC for the District of New Jersey. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2006)
March 1, 2006 31
NOTICE by Martindale-Hubbell, Lexis/Nexis Inc. That Matter Remains Under Submission Pursuant to Local Rule 7-13 (Chan, Zesara) (Filed on 3/1/2006)
December 21, 2005 30 Opinion or Order of the Court
STIPULATION AND ORDER vacating case management conference and deadlines pending resolution of motion to dismiss; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 12/20/2006. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2005)
December 20, 2005 29
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b) of discussion of ADR options (Chan, Zesara) (Filed on 12/20/2005)
December 19, 2005 28
NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Chan, Zesara) (Filed on 12/19/2005)
November 1, 2005 26
Minute Entry: Motion to transfer held on 10/31/2005 before Judge Marilyn Hall Patel (Date Filed: 11/1/2005) (Court Reporter Juanita Gonzales.) (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/1/2005)
October 19, 2005 23
NOTICE by Inherent.Com Request for Oral Argument (Catalano, Patrick) (Filed on 10/19/2005)
October 17, 2005 22
Declaration of Fernando Marinez (Supplemental) in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1404 filed byMartindale-Hubbell, Lexis/Nexis Inc.. (Chan, Zesara) (Filed on 10/17/2005)
October 7, 2005 17 Opinion or Order of the Court
STIPULATION AND ORDER estending time to and including 30 days after resolution of motion to dismiss, for defendant to file responsive pleading to amended complaint; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 10/7/2005. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2005)
October 6, 2005 16 Opinion or Order of the Court
STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Martindale-Hubbell, Lexis/Nexis Inc.. (Chan, Zesara) (Filed on 10/6/2005)
September 15, 2005 14
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Martindale-Hubbell, Lexis/Nexis Inc. of Order Setting Initial Case Management Conference, et al. (Chan, Zesara) (Filed on 9/15/2005)
September 9, 2005 13 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 4 defendant's Motion for Leave to File motion to dismiss prior to initial case management conference (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2005)
August 30, 2005 3
NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding Pursuant to Local rule 3-13 by Martindale-Hubbell, Lexis/Nexis Inc. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2005) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/9/2005 (gba, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Inherent.Com v. Martindale-Hubbell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexis/Nexis Inc.
Represented By: Tracy A. Donsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martindale-Hubbell
Represented By: Tracy A. Donsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inherent.Com
Represented By: Patrick Earl Catalano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?