The County of Santa Clara v. Astra USA, Inc et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv03740
Filed: September 15, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Other Statutory Actions Office
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
Referring Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1441 Petition for Removal

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 20, 2011 769 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF SANTA CRUZ COUNTY'S MOTION TO ALLOW DISCLOSURE OFDISCOVERY PRODUCED IN THIS ACTION TO THE GOVERNMENT FOR USE IN FALSE CLAIMS ACT ACTION by Hon. William Alsup denying 757 Motion for Discovery.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2011)
July 19, 2011 768 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING JULY 21 HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 19, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2011)
June 14, 2011 759 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING DATE AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTION TO ALLOW DISCLOSURE OF DISCOVERY PRODUCED IN THIS ACTION TO THE GOVERNMENT Motion Hearing set for 7/21/2011 02:00 PM before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 14, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2011)
May 13, 2011 754 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF THE COUNTY OF SANTA CRUZ. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 13, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2011)
September 30, 2010 740 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING ACTION PENDING DECISION FROM U.S. SUPREME COURT. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 30, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2010)
September 20, 2010 732 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION TO SEAL PORTIONS OF TRANSCRIPT IF SUCH TRANSCRIPT IS ORDERED by Judge Alsup granting 729 Motion for Leave to File (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2010)
September 10, 2010 721 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION OF EVA DIETZ PRO HAC VICE by Judge Alsup granting 718 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2010)
September 1, 2010 707 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SUSTAINING DEFENDANT AVENTIS'S OBJECTION AND QUASHING PLAINTIFFS' PRODUCT DESIGNATION IN DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 1, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2010)
August 30, 2010 701 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT AVENTIS'S MOTION TO SEAL PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT AVENTIS'S OBJECTIONS by Judge Alsup denying 697 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2010)
August 23, 2010 693 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO SEAL THEIR RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT AVENTIS'S OBJECTIONS by Judge Alsup denying 687 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
August 13, 2010 691 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONCERNING DEFENDANT AVENTIS'S OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFFS' PRODUCT DESIGNATION. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 13, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
August 10, 2010 686 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANT AVENTIS'S OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' DESIGNATION OF AMBIEN IN DISCOVERY REQUESTS. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 10, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 5, 2010 683 Opinion or Order of the Court FURTHER ORDER CLARIFYING THIRD AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER RE NON-PARTY SUBPOENAS. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 5, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2010)
August 3, 2010 682 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CLARIFYING THIRD AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER RE NON-PARTY SUBPOENAS. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 3, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2010)
July 12, 2010 675 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT AVENTIS'S MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 12, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2010)
July 8, 2010 665 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING MOTION FOR CORRECTIVE ACTION REGARDING BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB'S COMMUNICATIONS WITH PUTATIVE CLASS MEMBERS AND ATTEMPT TO OBTAIN ACCORD AND SATISFACTION by Judge William Alsup [granting in part and denying in part 628 Motion to Amend/Correct]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2010)
July 6, 2010 648 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR TAP TO FILE DECLARATION by Judge Alsup granting 646 Motion for Extension of Time to File (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2010)
June 23, 2010 640 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION OF DIANA P. CORTES FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 23, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2010)
June 14, 2010 633 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF WAYNE MATUS PRO HAC VICE by Judge Alsup granting 626 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
May 11, 2010 618 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION OF ERICA SMITH-KLOCEK FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE by Judge Alsup granting 616 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2010)
May 4, 2010 612 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE MERCK'S LETTER RE DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 4, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2010)
March 29, 2010 610 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CLARIFYING STAGE ONE DISCOVERY ORDER [re 605 Order on Motion for Protective Order, Order on Motion to Stay, Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, Order on Motion to Compel]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/29/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2010)
March 19, 2010 605 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS by Judge William Alsup [denying 555 Motion for Protective Order; granting in part and denying in part 557 Motion to Stay; denying 559 Motion for Protective Order; denying 564 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; granting in part and denying in part 592 Motion to Compel]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2010)
February 18, 2010 588 Opinion or Order of the Court CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 587 .ORDER GRANTING IN PART REQUEST TO MODIFY BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 18, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2010)
February 17, 2010 587 Opinion or Order of the Court *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 588 *** ORDER GRANTING IN PART REQUEST TO MODIFY BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 17, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2010) Modified on 2/18/2010 (whalc2, COURT STAFF).
February 12, 2010 585 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CLARIFYING WITHDRAWAL OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 12, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2010)
December 18, 2009 550 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER WITHDRAWING REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE LARSON FOR DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 18, 2009. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2009)
December 17, 2009 549 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING SCHEDULE FOR ADDITIONAL DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 17, 2009. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2009)
December 10, 2009 517 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 10, 2009. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2009)
October 28, 2009 496 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen denying without prejudice 431 Defendants' Motion to Compel Further Responses to Rog No. 1; requiring further meet and confer re 434 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Defendants' Pricing Data; and finding moot 448 Defendants' Motion to Compel Compliance with Notices of Deposition (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2009)
October 22, 2009 490 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ROBERT J. MCCULLY. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 22, 2009. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2009)
October 14, 2009 456 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re 452 Defendants' Letter of October 9, 2009; 454 Joint Letter of October 13, 2009; and 455 Plaintiff's Letter of October 13, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/14/2009. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2009)
October 13, 2009 480 Opinion or Order of the Court USCA ORDER - The unopposed motion by the USA for an extension to file an amicus brief is granted (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2009)
October 5, 2009 446 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 5, 2009. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2009)
September 28, 2009 439 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED JOINT REQUEST FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE [re 428 Stipulation filed by The County of Santa Clara, The County of Santa Cruz]. Case management conference set for Friday, October 2, 2009, at 9:00 AM. Please file a joint case management statement no later than noon on October 1, 2009. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 9/28/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2009)
September 17, 2009 427 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION OF KRISTEN M. HICKS FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 17, 2009. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2009)
September 3, 2009 424 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 392 Defendants' Joint Motion to Compel Santa Clara to Produce Documents and 391 Defendant Pfizer's Motion to Compel Santa Cruz to Produce Outstanding Discovery; and Granting 384 Defendants Bayer and 393 Schering-Plough's Motions to Compel Answers to Interrogatory No. 1. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2009)
September 1, 2009 422 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER allowing appearance by phone re 419 Letter filed by SmithKline Beecham Corporation, dba GlaxoSmithKline, 420 Letter filed by SmithKline Beecham Corporation, dba GlaxoSmithKline. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/1/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2009)
August 17, 2009 407 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE CROSS MOTIONS FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND TO COMPEL; ORDER VACATING HEARING by Judge Alsup denying 381 Motion for Protective Order (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2009)
May 5, 2009 364 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING CLASS CERTIFICATIONdenying 317 Motion to Certify Class; granting 343 Motion to Seal; granting 345 Motion to Seal Document ; denying 352 Motion in Limine (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2009)
March 30, 2009 350 Opinion or Order of the Court USCA ORDER - Appellant's unopposed motion to expedite this appeal is granted. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2009)
March 11, 2009 336 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 335 Joint Letter of March 10, 2009. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/11/2009. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2009)
March 9, 2009 331 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re Letters of February 19 and March 4, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/9/2009. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2009)
March 3, 2009 327 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/3/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2009)
March 2, 2009 326 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF RECUSAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 3/2/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2009)
February 26, 2009 324 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE HEARING ON MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2009)
February 23, 2009 322 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 2/23/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2009)
February 19, 2009 316 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR DISCOVERY [re 315 Letter filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 2/19/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2009)
February 3, 2009 310 Opinion or Order of the Court USCA ORDER - Petition for Permission to Appeal is Granted. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2009)
December 24, 2008 285 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 282 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611026632.) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611026632.) filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 12/24/08. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2008)
December 18, 2008 279 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE JANUARY 8, 2009, CALENDAR. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 12/17/2008. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2008)
December 17, 2008 281 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Settlement Conference set for 7/28/2009 at 09:30 AM. Confidential settlement conference statements to be lodged, not filed, with Judge Spero's chambers by 7/14/09. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/17/008. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2008)
November 25, 2008 269 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND CERTIFYING INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) by Judge Alsup granting 244 Motion for Protective Order (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2008)
October 20, 2008 255 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Further Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 12/12/2008 01:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Joint scheduling conference statement with proposes scheduled due by 12/5/2008. Lead counsel to contact CourtCall by 12/5/2008.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/17/08. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2008)
September 4, 2008 228 Opinion or Order of the Court STANDING ORDER FOR ALL JUDGES OF THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2008)
September 30, 2005 50 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 49 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/19/04. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2005)
September 22, 2005 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 22 EXTENDING TIME FOR ALL DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/22/05. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2005)
September 19, 2005 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 19, 2005. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The County of Santa Clara v. Astra USA, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?