Ramos v. Ayers

Case Number: 3:2005cv03752
Filed: September 16, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Ptn for Writ of H/C - Stay of Execution
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 12, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND GRANTING PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR A STAY 26 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/12/2014)
July 22, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding Procedural Matters Related to the Mixed Finalized Petition. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 7/21/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2014)
April 30, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Petition (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2014)
July 21, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EQUITABLE TOLLING 13 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/21/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramos v. Ayers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?