United States of America v. Cohan

Case Number: 3:2005cv03792
Filed: September 20, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7402 IRS: Petition to Enforce IRS Summons
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 29, 2005 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to show cause. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 9/29/05. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2005)
September 26, 2005 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE Case Management Conference set for 12/22/2005 02:30 PM.. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/26/05. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2005)
September 23, 2005 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re Enforcement of IRS Summons Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 12/2/2005 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 9/23/05. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2005)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Cohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?