Keen, LLC v. Keen et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv03796
Filed: September 20, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 28, 2005 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 31 Motion for TRO, denying 33 Motion for expedited discovery (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2005)
September 27, 2005 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Case Management Conference set for 1/26/2006 02:30 PM.. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/27/05. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2005)
September 26, 2005 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting hrg date and deadline for response. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 9/26/05. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2005)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keen, LLC v. Keen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?