Osanitsch v. Marconi PLC

Case Number: 3:2005cv03988
Filed: October 3, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 22, 2010 158 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for Dismissal with prejudice re 157 Stipulation filed by Marconi PLC. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/22/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2010)
April 29, 2010 152 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to continue hearing on motion re 151 Stipulation filed by Marconi PLC, Telent Ltd., Marconi Communications, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 151 Stipulation, 126 MOTION for Attorney Fees. Motion Hearing set for 5/28/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/29/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2010)
April 9, 2010 150 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to continue hearing re 149 Stipulation filed by Marconi PLC, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 149 Stipulation, 126 MOTION for Attorney Fees. Motion Hearing set for 4/30/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/9/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2010)
March 11, 2010 147 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 146 Stipulation filed by Marconi PLC, Telent Ltd., Marconi Communications, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 146 Stipulation, 126 MOTION for Attorney Fees. Motion Hearing reset for 4/9/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/11/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2010)
January 22, 2010 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to continue hearing re 128 Stipulation filed by John Osanitsch, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 128 Stipulation, 126 MOTION for Attorney Fees. Motion Hearing set for 3/12/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/21/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2010)
December 22, 2009 124 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of defendants and against plaintiff. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on December 22, 2009. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2009) Modified on 12/23/2009 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
December 21, 2009 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 86 Motion for Summary Judgment (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2009)
November 10, 2009 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer finding as moot 112 Motion to Shorten Time; granting 114 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2009)
October 8, 2009 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting in part and denying in part as moot 88 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2009)
October 1, 2009 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting re 94 Stipulation To Continue Hearing on Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Marconi PLC, John Osanitsch Motion Hearing set for 11/6/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/1/09. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2009)
January 28, 2009 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER extending time to answer re 70 Stipulation filed by Marconi PLC. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/28/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2009)
November 14, 2008 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Amended complaint due 12/19/08. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2008) Modified on 11/17/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Osanitsch v. Marconi PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?