K.C., et al v. O'Connell, et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv04077
Filed: October 11, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 29:0794 Job Discrimination (Handicap)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 8, 2015 171 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION RE: FINAL JUDGMENT BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE SPERO; ORDER OF REFERENCE The Clerk of Court is directed to reassign the matter to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for all further proceedings and entry of judgment on the issue of attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 8, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2015)
April 24, 2015 165 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING MATTER TO MAGISTRATE This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for the purpose of overseeing the parties' process towards resolving the amount of reasonable attorneys' fees and costs incurred fo r monitoring compliance with the express terms of the parties' settlement agreement and their reasonable attorneys' fees and expenses for the work necessary in this Court and the Ninth Circuit to resolve this motion forfees. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 24, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2015)
April 22, 2015 164 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING ALL PARTIES TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE AT APRIL 24, 2015 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 22, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2015)
April 21, 2015 162 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION the State Defendants' motion for leave to file a motion for reconsideration is denied. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 21, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2015)
March 20, 2015 153 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DEFERRING IN PART RULING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND EXPENSES The Court finds plaintiffs are entitled to an award of reasonable attorneys' fees and costs incurred for monitoring compl iance with the parties' settlement agreement, and grants plaintiffs' motion to said extent. The Court defers ruling on the amount of such award, and the parties are directed to submit to the Court, no later than April 17, 2015, a proposed form of order setting forth the parameters of the Court's reference of the matter to a Magistrate Judge for the purpose of overseeing the parties' discussions as to resolution of the remaining issue. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 20, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2015)
January 5, 2015 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON SUPPLEMENTAL JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT The supplemental joint case management statement, Dkt. No. 144, is approved as the Case Management Order for this case and all parties shall comply with its provisions. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 5, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2015)
December 10, 2014 142 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING ALL PARTIES TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE AT SCHEDULING CONFERENCE All parties shall appear via telephone at the Scheduling Conference on December 12, 2014. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 10, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2014)
October 29, 2014 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE A case management conference is set for December 12, 2014 at 10:30 a.m. A joint case management conference statement shall be filed no later than December 5, 2014. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 29, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2014)
April 20, 2012 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 101 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND EXPENSES. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 20, 2012. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2012)
March 26, 2012 123 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY IN COMPLIANCE WITH GENERAL ORDER 45 AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 26, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2012)
March 7, 2012 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL MATERIAL. Plaintiffs shall file, no later than March 9, 2012, the revised supplemental memorandum attached as Exhibit A to plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion to File Supplemental Materi al. No later than March 23, 2012, defendants shall file their responsive memorandum, not to exceed five pages in length, at which time, unless the Court finds a hearing is necessary, the matter will stand submitted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 7, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2012)
January 18, 2012 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO LODGE CHAMBES COPY IN COMPLIANCE WITH GENERAL ORDER 45 AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 18, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2012)
December 15, 2011 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO RESCHEDULE BRIEFING SCHEDULE DATES ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES. Defendants' opposition shall be filed on or before January 4, 2012. Plaintiff's reply shall be filed on or before January 11, 2012. A hearing on the motion shall be conducted on January 27, 2012. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 15, 2011. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2011)
March 14, 2007 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating 79 order of dismissal; continuing status conference from April 27, 2007 to June 15, 2007; continuing deadline for San Ramon and State defendants to file motions to dismiss from April 15, 2007 to June 15, 2007. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 3/14/2007. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2007)
March 8, 2007 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice due to settlement; provided, however, that if any party hereto shall certify to this Court, within ninety days, with proof of service of a copy thereof on opposing counsel, that the agreed consideration for the settlement has not been delivered, the foregoing order shall stand vacated and the action shall forthwith be restored to the calendar to be set for trial. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 3/8/2007. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2007)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: K.C., et al v. O'Connell, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?