Venson v. Evans et al
Case Number: 3:2005cv04136
Filed: October 13, 2005
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 134 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/2/14. (nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2014)
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 118 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER re 117 Case Management Conference - Initial. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 6/18/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2013)
April 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/6/2013. Case Management Conference set for 6/13/2013 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/17/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2013)
March 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding; case not settled. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 3/25/09. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2009)
March 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER AND WRIT of of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum to transport plaintiff issued. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 3/2/09. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2009) Modified on 3/2/2009 (far, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Venson v. Evans et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?