Walters et al v. Smith

Case Number: 3:2005cv04209
Filed: October 18, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 25, 2011 59 Opinion or Order of the Court WRIT of Execution Issued as to Terry E. Smith; Essayone Inc., aka Yreka Construction dba Frontier Construction; $93,007.42. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2011)
October 8, 2010 55 Opinion or Order of the Court WRIT of Execution issued as to Terry E. Smith; Essayone Inc., aka Yreka Construction, in the amount of $204,360.01. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2010)
September 9, 2009 52 Opinion or Order of the Court WRIT of Execution issued (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2009)
September 8, 2009 51 Opinion or Order of the Court *** INCORRECT FILING- SEE DOC. #52*** WRIT of Execution issued (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2009) Modified on 9/10/2009 (sis, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walters et al v. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?