Mosley v. Oroski

Case Number: 3:2005cv04260
Filed: October 20, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 19, 2012 77 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re bail for Petitioner Ron Mosley is rescinded and the personal appearance bond is exonerated. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/18/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2012)
September 9, 2011 72 Opinion or Order of the Court PS8 from Victoria Gibson re: Ron Mosley for no action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 9/8/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2011)
May 4, 2011 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER-PS8 as to Ron Mosley, this matter does not require any action by the Court at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge JAMES LARSON on 5/3/11. (bjtS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2011)
March 4, 2011 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson denying 55 Respondent's motion to revoke bail. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2011)
February 9, 2011 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting in part 56 Motion to shorten time. Petitioner's opposition to 55 Respondent's motion to revoke bail shall be filed on or before 02/15/11. Respondent's reply shall be filed on or before 02/22/11. Unless both parties waive a hearing, the matter will be heard on 02/28/11 at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom No. 2, 17th Floor, 450 Golden Gate Ave., San Francisco. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2011)
February 8, 2011 58 Opinion or Order of the Court Pretrial Service Form 8 by Victoria Gibson as to Ron Mosley for direction from the Court. No action by this Court at this time. Signed by Judge James Larson on 2/8/11. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/8/2011: # 1 Certificate of Service) (fj, COURT STAFF).
December 23, 2010 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Forth Conditions of Release as to Ron Mosley. Signed by Judge James Larson on 12/23/10. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2010)
December 21, 2010 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting 34 Motion for bail. Matter is referred to the General Duty Magistrate Judge for bond hearing and to set conditions of release. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mosley v. Oroski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?