Marcelja v. Todd Shipyards Corporation et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv04347
Filed: October 25, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Asbestos Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 15, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' DISMISSAL OF HEIR RICHARD MARCELJA, JR., ONLY, WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 15, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2013)
September 27, 2012 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION, WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 27, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2012)
September 24, 2012 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 24, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2012)
August 1, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER, Case reopened. IN RE: ASBESTOS PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (NO.VI) MDL No. 875. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 7/5/12. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marcelja v. Todd Shipyards Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?