Jaffe v. Kramer

Case Number: 3:2005cv04439
Filed: November 1, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Martin J. Jenkins
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 21, 2015 103 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, ***Civil Case Terminated.. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/21/2015. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2015)
June 27, 2014 95 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting in part and denying in part 86 Motion to Dismiss.(pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2014)
December 20, 2013 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Vacating Deadlines, ***Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/20/2013. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
November 8, 2013 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Answer due by 1/7/2014. Response/opposition due by 2/6/2014. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/8/2013. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2013)
October 25, 2012 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton dismissing unexhausted claim andgranting 68 Motion to Stay (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2012)
June 20, 2012 67 Opinion or Order of the Court BRIEFING ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 6/20/12. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jaffe v. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?