Smith v. Taylor

Case Number: 3:2005cv04528
Filed: November 7, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 23, 2010 23 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/23/10. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2010)
March 23, 2010 22 Featured Case ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by David Alan Smith, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/23/10. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2010)
September 28, 2009 21 NOTICE of Change of Address by David Alan Smith (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2009)
September 9, 2009 20 CLERKS NOTICE Effective September 14, 2009, Judge Phyllis Hamilton's courtroom and chambers will be located in the Oakland Courthouse, Courtroom #3, 3rd floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, California 94612.On or after September 14, 2009, all filings for matters pending on Judge Hamiltons docket, all court appearances, and all deliveries of chambers' copies of documents must be made at the Oakland Courthouse.The days and times for law and motion calendars and all currently scheduled proceedings remain unchanged.Please note that all of Judge Hamilton's case files will be moved to the Oakland Courthouse, therefore all cases numbers assigned to her will be changed slightly to reflect the correct venue. Previously, all case numbers started with "3:" to indicate the San Francisco office (Example: 3:09-cv-12345-PJH). As of September 14th, 2009, all of Judge Hamilton's case files will begin with "4:" to indicate the Oakland office, but everything else will stay the same (Example: 4:09-cv-12345-PJH). When e-filing, using the short case number format will always avoid problems when searching for the correct case: 09-12345 (YY-NNNNN).For information on the Oakland Courthouse's accessibility, parking, driving directions, public transit, hotels and other helpful links, please visit our website: http://www.cand.uscourts.gov, click on "Court Information" on the right hand side of our main page, then select the Oakland link under "Address and Jurisdiction". The main telephone number for the Oakland Division is 510 637-3530. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2009)
May 11, 2007 19 Featured Case ORDER RE ELECTRONIC FILING IN CASES WITH UNREPRESENTED PARTIES: Case designated for electronic filing. Effective immediately all represented parties will e-file their submissions to the court. Represented parties will be required to serve paper copies by mail on unrepresented parties. Unrepresented litigants will continue to file and serve all submissions to the court in paper form unless prior leave is obtained from the assigned judge. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn Walker dated 5/11/07. Copy mailed to counsel of record. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2007)
March 1, 2007 18 Traverse re 15 Response to Order to Show Cause byDavid Alan Smith. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2007)
February 1, 2007 17 NOTICE of Lodging of, and Index to, Exhibits by Derek Taylor (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2007)
February 1, 2007 16 MEMORANDUM in Support re 15 Response to Order to Show Cause filed byDerek Taylor. (Related document(s) 15 ) (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2007)
February 1, 2007 15 Response to Order to Show Cause 14 Order, byDerek Taylor. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2007)
December 1, 2006 14 Featured Case ORDER to SHOW CAUSE; RULINGS. Petitioner's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (doc 3) is DENIED as moot. His motion for appointment of counsel filed with the petition is DENIED. The clerk shall serve by regular mail a copy of this order and the petition on respondent and respondent's attorney, the Attorney General of the State of California. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 12/1/06. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2006)
October 24, 2006 13 CLERKS Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2006)
October 23, 2006 12 MANDATE of USCA. The judgment of the said District Court in this cause is REVERSED and REMANDED. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2006)
June 13, 2006 USCA Case Number 06-16033 (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2006)
May 30, 2006 Certificate of Record Mailed to USCA (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2006)
May 30, 2006 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2006)
May 26, 2006 11 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 6 Motion for Certificate of Appealability, granting in part and denying in part 8 Motion to Appoint Counsel/Proceed IFP, granting 9 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2006)
January 13, 2006 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by David Alan Smith re 8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2006)
January 13, 2006 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by David Alan Smith. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2006)
January 13, 2006 8 MOTION for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis and for appointment of counsel on appeal filed by David Alan Smith. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2006)
January 5, 2006 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by David Alan Smith re 6 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2006)
January 5, 2006 6 NOTICE of APPEAL and MOTION for Certificate of Appealability filed by David Alan Smith. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2006)
December 6, 2005 5 JUDGMENT in favor of Respondent against Petitioner. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/6/05. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2005)
December 6, 2005 4 Featured Case ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/6/05. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2005)
November 14, 2005 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by David Alan Smith. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2005)
November 14, 2005 2 Letter from Petitioner to Clerk re trust account withdrawal order. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2005)
November 7, 2005 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5, Receipt No. 3378147). Filed byDavid Alan Smith. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2005)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?