McCloskey et al v. Helmick et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv04641
Filed: November 10, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 9, 2014 134 Opinion or Order of the Court REQUEST AND ORDER TO DISMISS ACTION WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 9, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
February 12, 2014 132 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference is continued to May 16, 2014. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 12, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2014)
December 9, 2013 130 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference currently scheduled for December 13, 2013 is continued to February 14, 2014. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 9, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2013)
March 20, 2013 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 118 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION; VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 20, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2013)
February 22, 2013 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENT IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Plaintiffs are hereby ORDERED immediately submit chambers copies of the their Motion for Reconsideration of Order Enforcing Settlement Agreement. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 22, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2013)
January 11, 2013 115 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued from January 18, 2013 to February 1, 2013. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 11, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2013)
December 4, 2012 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The December 7, 2012 Case Management Conference is continued to January 18, 2013. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 4, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2012)
October 29, 2012 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 29, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2012)
March 23, 2012 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING ORDER OF DISMISSAL; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The matter will remain open pending filing of a motion for approval of a minor's compromise and the Court's ruling thereon. The Order of Dismissal, filed March 22, 2012, is vacated, and the Case Management Conference, previously scheduled for today's date, is continued to June 22, 2012. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 23, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2012)
March 22, 2012 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Plaintiffs' claims are dismissed without prejudice; provided, however, that if any party hereto shall certify to this Court, within ninety days, with proof of service of a copy thereon on opposing counsel, that the agreed co nsideration for the settlement has not been delivered, the foregoing order shall stand vacated and the action shall forthwith be restored to the calendar for further proceedings as appropriate. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 22, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2012)
February 28, 2012 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 28, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2012)
January 17, 2012 81 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Settlement Conference re-set for 2/29/2012 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C.Spero on 1/17/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2012)
December 8, 2011 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 8, 2011. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2011)
August 5, 2011 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: STIPULATION CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Pursuant to stipulation, the August 12, 2011 case management conference is continued to December 9, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 8/5/2011. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2011)
April 12, 2011 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION AND STIPULATION MODIFYING CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE AND SETTING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Pursuant to stipulation, the April 15, 2011 Case Management Conference is continued to August 12, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 4/12/2011. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2011)
January 4, 2011 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION AND STIPULATION FOR ORDER MODIFYING CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE AND SETTING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Ordered that the March 29, 2011 Pre-Trial Conference and April 11, 2011 Jury Trial dates in this matter be vacated and that the Case Management Conference currently set for January 14, 2011 be continued to April 15, 2011 at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2011)
December 8, 2010 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION AND STIPULATION FOR ORDER MODIFYING CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE AND SETTING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. A Case Management Conference is set for January 14, 2011, at 10:30 a.m. The parties shall file a Joint Case Management Statement on or before January 7, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2010)
April 8, 2010 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: STIPULATION FOR AN ORDER MODIFYING SCHEDULE. The pretrial filing deadline of April 13, 2010, the Pretrial Conference scheduled to take place on April 27, 2010, and the Jury Trial date of May 10, 2010 are vacated. A Status Conference is set for May 28, 2010, at 10:30 a.m.; a Joint Status Conference Statement shall be filed no later than May 21, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 8, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2010)
April 17, 2009 41 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 4/17/2009. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2009)
February 4, 2009 38 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE STATUS CONFERENCE. The Status Conference is continued to April 17, 2009. A Joint Status Conference Statement shall be filed no later than April 10, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 4, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2009)
February 1, 2008 32 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER vacating Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference dates. The parties shall provide a joint status report on May 1, 2008, and every three months thereafter. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 1, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCloskey et al v. Helmick et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?