American Council of the Blind et al v. Barnhart et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv04696
Filed: November 16, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Martin J. Jenkins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 29:0794 Job Discrimination (Handicap)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 16, 2012 383 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING LETTER RECEIVED ON APRIL 13, 2012.. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 16, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2012)
April 2, 2010 376 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND ORDER AMENDING COMPLIANCE SCHEDULE AND VACATING HEARING by Judge Alsup granting 372 Motion to Amend/Correct ; (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2010)
March 26, 2010 374 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SHORTEN TIME. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 26, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2010)
February 9, 2010 371 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING JOINT NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ATTORNEY'S FEES. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 9, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2010)
January 14, 2010 365 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING ON REVISED IMPLEMENTATION PLAN. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 14, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2010)
January 5, 2010 354 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING MOTION TO AMEND FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 5, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2010)
December 29, 2009 351 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING JANUARY 14 HEARING DATE FOR THE REVISED IMPLEMENTATION PLAN. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 29, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2009)
December 2, 2009 339 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER REGARDING NOTICE OF IMPLEMENTATION OF JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 2, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2009)
November 30, 2009 336 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING JOINTLY PROPOSED LANGUAGE FOR NOTICE OF IMPLEMENTATION OF JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 30, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2009)
November 3, 2009 328 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 3, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2009)
October 30, 2009 327 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MASSIVE EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ATTORNEY'S FEE REQUEST. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 30, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2009)
October 20, 2009 324 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/20/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2009)
September 22, 2009 307 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING FORMAT OF PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW AFTER BENCH TRIAL. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 22, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2009)
September 11, 2009 276 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 11, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2009)
September 9, 2009 275 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 9, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2009)
July 14, 2009 224 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE NEW DATES FOR TRIAL (SEPTEMBER 14, 2009) AND FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (SEPTEMBER 2, 2009). Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/14/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2009)
June 15, 2009 170 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION FOR DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 15, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2009)
June 12, 2009 169 Opinion or Order of the Court REMINDER NOTICE OF UPCOMING TRIAL (9/8/2009) AND FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (8/24/2009 AT 2:00 PM). Signed by Judge William Alsup on 6/12/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2009)
April 8, 2009 164 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re 163 Letter filed by Billie Jean Keith, Laura M. Russell, George P. Smith, Mary Ann Alexander, Scarlett Miles, Arlene Doherty, Alice Marjorie Donovan, American Council of the Blind, Marvelena Quesada]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 4/8/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2009)
March 27, 2009 162 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO AMEND THE FACT DISCOVERY CUT-OFF DATE. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 27, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2009)
March 4, 2009 158 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION TO WITHDRAW PLAINTIFFS TAMMY RENEE COOPER AND DOROTHY JACKSON AS NAMED PLAINTIFFS AND CLASS REPRESENTATIVES AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 4, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2009)
February 23, 2009 154 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE STIPULATION TO WITHDRAW TAMMY RENEE COOPER AND DOROTHY JACKSON AS NAMED PLAINTIFFS AND CLASS REPRESENTATIVES. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 23, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2009)
January 23, 2009 152 Opinion or Order of the Court CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 151. ORDER granting 150 Motion to Align Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 23, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2009)
December 2, 2008 146 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND DATES IN CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER TO DECEMBER 4, 2008, AT 3:30 P.M. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 12/2/2008. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2008)
November 20, 2008 142 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION CONCERNING WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 20, 2008. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2008)
October 3, 2008 132 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE NOTICE OF CLASS DEFINITION. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 3, 2008. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
September 11, 2008 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Alsup granting in part and denying in part 97 Motion to Certify Class (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Council of the Blind et al v. Barnhart et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?