Alexander et al v G.D. Searle LLC et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv04781
Filed: November 21, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 22, 2009 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE re 93 Stipulation filed by Pfizer Inc, Vicki Bennett, Joann Fedorov, Kenneth Finch, Tony Gracco, Gary Hauger, Gene Hay, Juanita Howard, Birdie R. Johnson, Betty Justice, Billy S. Long, Hurrel G Nelson, Hildegard Rekhus, Jan Marie Richendollar, Barbara Russaw, Susie Russell, Carl Stonerock, Mary Turner, John Williams, Mary Wilson, Henrietta Wright, Paul Zurschmit, Shannon Bagley and David V Baker terminated.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/22/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2009)
October 1, 2009 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Jonathan Halley terminated.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/25/09. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2009)
September 30, 2009 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting re 61 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Merlvin Perkins. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/28/09. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2009)
September 1, 2009 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/31/2009. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2009)
May 11, 2009 58 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal; Johnnie C. Scott terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/30/09. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2009)
December 5, 2005 2 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL ORDER Pretrial Conference set for 12/8/2005 02:15 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/08/05. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2005)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexander et al v G.D. Searle LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?