Chacon v. Gallian et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv04880
Filed: November 29, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 22, 2008 74 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: (1) In favor of plaintiff and against defendants Michelle Edwards, Victor Gorospe, and Robert Munoz on the negligence claim, (2) in favor of defendant Lloyd Goulter on the negligence claim, (3) in favor of defendants Michelle Edwards, Victor Gorospe, Robert Munoz, and Lloyd Gouleter on the Eighth Amendment claim, and (4) dismissing all other defendants. Signed by Judge Susan Illston. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2008)
December 15, 2008 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Illston granting 65 Ex Parte Application (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2008)
November 25, 2008 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Ms. Graham to appear by phone (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2008)
November 20, 2008 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum. Signed by Judge Illston on 11/20/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2008)
November 12, 2008 55 Opinion or Order of the Court Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding; case did not settle. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 11/12/08. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chacon v. Gallian et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?