Alexander et al v. Lockheed Martin Corporation et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv04945
Filed: November 30, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Martin J. Jenkins
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Asbestos Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 29, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE re Voluntary Dismissal OF ENTIRE ACTION, WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/25/2016. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2016)
July 1, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO DEFENDANT GENERAL ELECTRIC AND PLAINTIFFS REGARDING STATUS OF SETTLEMENTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 7/1/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2016)
June 24, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 34 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Stanley Sparks. DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION FOR STANLEY SPARKS ONLY, WITHOUT PREJUDICE (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2014)
December 2, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Dismissal without prejudice re 31 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by General Electric Company, Philip Thornburg terminated.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/22/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
September 25, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Hon. Jeffrey S. White no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/25/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2012)
August 13, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER (MDL 875) by MDL Panel remanding case back to the Northern District of CA; Case reopened. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexander et al v. Lockheed Martin Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?