Pedraza et al v. Alameda Unified School District et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv04977
Filed: December 1, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Vaughn R. Walker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 28, 2011 240 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Due to the pending retirement of the undersigned, the clerk is directed to re-assign this case. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 1/28/2011. (Attachments: # 1 proof of service)(cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2011)
November 8, 2010 232 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing defendants to file a reply of not more than ten pages on or before November 19, 2010. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2010)
March 12, 2009 181 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 167 166 165 163 . Plaintiff has fourteen days to respond to defendants' motions. The hearing scheduled for 3/19/2009 is vacated. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2009)
January 12, 2009 160 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 159 Denying MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Linda Pedraza (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2009)
January 6, 2009 154 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 153 Statement filed by Linda Pedraza. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2009)
November 26, 2008 149 Opinion or Order of the Court ERRONEOUS DOCKET ENTRY - PLEASE DISREGARDORDER declining to rule on anti-SLAPP motion until case is resolved on the merits. Signed by Judge Walker on 11/26/2008. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2008) Modified on 11/26/2008 (gsa, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pedraza et al v. Alameda Unified School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?