Greger Leasing Corp. et al v. Barge PT. Potrero, et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv05117
Filed: December 12, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 19, 2008 150 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 12/19/08. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2008)
November 6, 2008 147 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti denying 129 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying 132 Motion for Attorney Fees (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2008)
September 3, 2008 127 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANT BARGE PT. POTRERO, WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 9/3/08. (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2008)
December 12, 2005 11 Opinion or Order of the Court WARRANT of Arrest issued of Vessel In Rem. Signed by Senior Judge Samuel Conti on 12/12/05. (aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 12/12/2005)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greger Leasing Corp. et al v. Barge PT. Potrero, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?