Asis Internet Services v. Optin Global, Inc. et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv05124
Filed: December 12, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 14, 2010 491 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OVERRULING re 488 Memorandum in Opposition to Debtor's Examination filed by Asis Internet Services. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/14/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2010)
May 19, 2010 483 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 471 Motion for Sanctions (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2010)
February 3, 2010 475 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND HEARING DATE re 471 MOTION for Sanctions Oppostion due by 2/12/2010. Replies due by 2/19/2010. Motion Hearing re-set for 4/30/2010 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/3/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2010)
December 17, 2008 451 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting in part and denying in part 443 Motion to Stay Taxation of Costs and Plaintiff's Objections to Taxation of Costs. Costs taxed in the amount of $ $31,115.59 against Plaintiff. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2008)
September 4, 2008 442 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting re 440 Stipulation Re-Designation And Use of Documents Produced By Google Inc. filed by Azoogle.Com, Inc.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 9/4/08. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Asis Internet Services v. Optin Global, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?