Krzesniak v. Cendant Corporation et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv05156
Filed: December 13, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 18, 2010 167 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE, CLOSING FILE re 166 Stipulation filed by Stanley Krzesniak. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/18/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2010)
March 11, 2010 165 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CMC re 164 Case Management Statement filed by Stanley Krzesniak. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/11/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2010)
February 12, 2010 163 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CMC re 162 Stipulation filed by Stanley Krzesniak. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/12/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2010)
January 12, 2010 161 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CMC re 160 Stipulation filed by Stanley Krzesniak. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/12/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2010)
November 30, 2009 159 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CMC re 158 Stipulation filed by Stanley Krzesniak. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/30/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2009)
November 3, 2009 157 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CMC. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/3/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2009)
September 17, 2009 155 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CMC. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/17/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2009)
March 19, 2009 153 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING 3/26/09 STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER SCHEDULING FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE ON 9/24/09. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/19/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
October 7, 2008 149 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CMC. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/7/2008. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2008)
October 1, 2008 147 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CMC TO NOV 6, 2008 re 146 Stipulation filed by Cendant Car Rental Operations Support Inc., Cendant Corporation, Budget Rent-A-Car Systems, Inc, Cendant Car Rental Group. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/1/2008. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2008)
September 26, 2008 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE-OPENING CASE AS TO PLAINTIFF'S INDIVIDUAL FMLA AND CFRA CLAIMS; REVISED PARTIAL JUDGMENT AND DISMISSAL OF CLASS ACTION CLAIMS; ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 143 Order. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/26/2008. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2008)
September 18, 2008 143 Opinion or Order of the Court Judgment and Dismissal of Action with Prejudice on Final Approval of Settlement; Order closing file. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/18/2008. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krzesniak v. Cendant Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?