United States of America et al v. Folger

Case Number: 3:2005cv05209
Filed: December 16, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7402 IRS: Petition to Enforce IRS Summons
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 30, 2005 6 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT JUDGE re 4 Order, 5 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge filed by United States of America,. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/30/2005. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2005)
December 29, 2005 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE A CONSENT OR DECLINATION FORM. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/29/2005. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2005)
December 27, 2005 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/27/2005. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2005)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America et al v. Folger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?