Harbor v. Alameda-Contra Costa Transit District

Case Number: 3:2005cv05211
Filed: December 16, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Referring Judge:
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 18, 2009 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR REMAND. The motion is set for hearing on June 26, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 18, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2009)
May 4, 2009 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ERRONEOUSLY POSTED: PLEASE DISREGARD ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 5/12/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/4/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2009) Modified on 5/5/2009 (aaa, COURT STAFF).
February 18, 2009 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The February 20, 2009 Case Management Conference is continued to April 10, 2009. A Joint Case Management Conference Statement shall be filed no later than April 3, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 18, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2009)
November 14, 2008 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued to February 20, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 14, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harbor v. Alameda-Contra Costa Transit District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?