Perez v. Tilton et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv05241
Filed: December 19, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 15, 2013 738 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUIRING REIMBURSEMENT signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 05/15/2013 (copy provided to Finance Office). (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2013)
March 28, 2013 737 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO DEFENDANTS TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THEY HAVE NOT COMPLIED WITH ORDER DATED JANUARY 14, 2013 REQUIRING DEPOSIT OF FUNDS. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 3/28/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2013)
March 20, 2013 734 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO DEFENDANTS TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THEY HAVE NOT COMPLIED WITH ORDER DATED JANUARY 14, 2013 REQUIRING DEPOSIT OF FUNDS. Show Cause Response due by 3/25/2013.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/20/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2013)
January 14, 2013 733 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUIRING DEPOSIT OF FUNDS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/14/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2013)
December 3, 2012 732 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 731 STIPULATION re Collection of Undisputed Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 12/3/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2012)
August 20, 2012 729 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 726 STIPULATION RE DISMISSAL OF CASE WITH PREJUDICE AND TERMINATION OF ALL PROVISIONS OF CONSENT DECREE EXCEPT PROVISIONS RELATED TO RENOVATION PROJECTS and TERMINATING 727 . Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 20, 2012.(jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2012)
August 6, 2012 725 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 724 Stipulation re Final Deposit of Costs. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 6, 2012. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2012)
July 26, 2012 723 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF CLARIFICATION. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 7/26/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2012)
July 25, 2012 720 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE DEPOSIT OF FUNDS. Signed by Judge Jeffery S. White on 7/25/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2012)
July 24, 2012 719 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE DECLARATION TO INITIATE CONTEMPT PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 7/24/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2012)
July 17, 2012 715 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO DEFENDANTS TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEPOSIT OF FUNDS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/17/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2012)
July 11, 2012 710 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO DEFENDANTS TO SHOW CAUSE RE DEPOSIT OF FUNDS. Show Cause Response due by 7/16/2012.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/11/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2012)
June 6, 2012 701 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 699 STIPULATIONre Collection of Undisputed Fees and Costs for Fourth Quarter 2011. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on June 6, 2012. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2012)
May 11, 2012 691 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: DEPOSIT OF FUNDS. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 5/11/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2012)
March 6, 2012 677 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 676 STIPULATION for Collection of Undisputed Fees for Third Quarter 2011. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 3/6/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2012)
January 30, 2012 669 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER GRANTING 651 MOTION for Payment. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 1/30/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2012)
December 6, 2011 656 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO DEPOSIT FUNDS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/6/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2011)
November 28, 2011 653 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 652 Stipulation for Periodic Collection of Fees for 1st and 2nd Quarter, 2011. Signed by Judge Jefffrey S. White on 11/28/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
August 3, 2011 633 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE: Status Report due by 10/28/2011. Status Conference set for 11/4/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/3/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2011)
April 13, 2011 610 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 609 Stipulation for Collection of Undisputed Attorneys' Fees and Costs for 3rd Quarter 2010. Signed by Judge Jeffery S. White on 4/13/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2011)
March 24, 2011 606 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 605 Stipulation Re: Deposit of Interim Costs. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/24/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2011)
March 3, 2011 598 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR COLLECTION OF 2009 AND 2010 FORMERLY DISPUTED ATTORNEYS' FEES. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/3/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2011)
February 22, 2011 592 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: DEPOSIT OF FUNDS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/22/11. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2011)
February 18, 2011 591 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 589 MOTION for Payment for Jay Shulman. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 2/18/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
February 15, 2011 590 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 588 MOTION Order for Payment for Joseph D. Scalzo. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/15/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2011)
January 24, 2011 585 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 581 MOTION for Payment for Jay Shulman. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/24/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2011)
January 19, 2011 584 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 580 MOTION for Payment for Joseph D. Scalzo. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 1/19/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2011)
December 7, 2010 574 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Continuing Status Conference: Status Report due by 2/25/2011. Status Conference set for 3/4/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/7/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2010)
November 24, 2010 570 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 564 MOTION for Payment for Jay Shulman. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/24/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2010)
November 1, 2010 563 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 562 MOTION FOR PAYMENT. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 11/1/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
October 15, 2010 561 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 558 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Payment. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/15/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2010)
October 13, 2010 560 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 559 Stipulation for Collection of Undisputed Attorneys' Fees and Costs for 1st Quarter 2010. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/12/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2010)
October 1, 2010 556 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND AMENDED ORDER FOR PAYMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/1/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2010)
September 29, 2010 555 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PAYMENT FOR JAY D. SHULMAN. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/29/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2010)
September 28, 2010 551 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 550 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Payment for Jay D. Shulman. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 9/28/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2010) Modified on 9/28/2010 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
August 27, 2010 544 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 543 Stipulation to Pay Plaintiffs Interim Fees and to Stay Motion to Compel Fees. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 8/27/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2010)
August 23, 2010 542 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 539 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Payment filed by Jay Shulman. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 8/23/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
July 27, 2010 533 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 532 MOTION for Payment for Jay Shulman. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/27/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2010)
July 19, 2010 531 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 527 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR PAYMENT filed by Joseph D. Scalzo. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/19/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2010)
July 14, 2010 530 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 529 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 7/14/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2010)
July 12, 2010 528 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON 526 Motion to Compel Payment for Disputed 2009 fees. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on July 12, 2010. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2010)
July 8, 2010 525 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 524 Stipulation to Stay Filing of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Payment of REasonable Paralegal Fees for Work Performed During 2009 Until the Resolution of Perez v. Cate, Appeal No. 09-17185. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on July 8, 2010. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2010)
June 28, 2010 523 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 522 MOTION and Order for Payment. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/28/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2010)
June 15, 2010 520 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 519 Administrative MOTION for Payment. Signed by Judge JEFFERY S. WHITE on 6/15/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2010)
June 1, 2010 518 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Statement due by 9/3/2010. Case Management Conference continued to 9/10/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/1/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2010)
May 17, 2010 513 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR PAYMENT. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 5/13/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2010)
May 11, 2010 509 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 508 Stipulation for Periodic Collection of Attorneys' Fees and Costs. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on May 11, 2010. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2010)
April 27, 2010 505 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE DEPOSIT OF FUNDS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/27/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2010)
April 26, 2010 504 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 502 AMENDED Administrative MOTION for Payment.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 4/26/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2010)
April 12, 2010 500 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 499 Joint MOTION to Continue the April 16, 2010 Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 5/28/2010. Case Management Conference set for 6/4/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 4/12/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
March 22, 2010 496 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Administrative Motion for Payment. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 3/22/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2010)
March 12, 2010 495 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING 493 Administrative Motion for Payment. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2010)
January 25, 2010 488 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 487 Stipulation for Collection of 3rd Quarter fees. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 1/25/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2010)
January 12, 2010 481 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE PAYMENT OF DR. SCALZO'S OCTOBER INVOICE (REDACTED VERSION). Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/12/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2010)
December 17, 2009 473 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 469 MOTION Extension of Time to Submit Joint Status Conference Statement. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 12/17/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2009)
December 2, 2009 460 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RELATING CASES; DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO SHOW CAUSE WHY MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JUIRISDICTION; AND SETTING MATTER ON CALENDAR ON DECEMBER 4, 2009 AT 1:30 P.M.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/2/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2009)
November 30, 2009 457 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 455 Stipulation re Plaintiffs Second Quarter Fees 2009. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 11/30/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2009)
November 13, 2009 454 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING 449 Motion for Payment. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2009)
November 12, 2009 452 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 451 Stipulation re Deposit of Interim Costs. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on November 12, 2009. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2009)
October 27, 2009 448 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADVANCING STATUS CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/27/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2009)
October 26, 2009 447 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE DEPOSIT OF FUNDS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/26/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2009)
October 22, 2009 446 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR PAYMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/22/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2009)
September 1, 2009 428 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING 399 Motion to Compel. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2009)
August 26, 2009 425 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White DENYING 422 Motion to Amend Stipulated Settlement Agreement. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2009)
August 25, 2009 424 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE of Questions for Hearing. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 25, 2009. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2009)
August 17, 2009 420 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 418 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR PAYMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/17/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2009)
June 18, 2009 400 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on June 18, 2009. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2009)
May 27, 2009 384 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DEPOSIT OF COSTS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on May 27, 2009. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2009)
May 21, 2009 383 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING 377 Motion for Payment. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2009)
May 8, 2009 381 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 380 Stipulation re Briefing on Motion to Compel Payment of Attorneys' Fees. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on May 8, 2009. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2009)
May 7, 2009 378 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 375 Re California Out-of-State Dental Screening Program. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/7/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2009)
April 27, 2009 374 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER RE PAYMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/27/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2009)
April 20, 2009 373 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 370 Request for Extension of Time re: Dental-Screening Protocol for Transfer of Inmates to Out-of-State Facilities. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/20/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2009)
March 23, 2009 367 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME RE: DENTAL SCREENING PROTOCOL FOR TRANSFER OF INMATES TO OUT-OF-STATE FACILITIES. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/23/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2009)
March 20, 2009 364 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 363 Stipulation For Periodic Collection of Attorneys' Fees and Costs. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/20/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2009) Modified on 3/20/2009 (jjo, COURT STAFF).
March 18, 2009 362 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 359 MOTION for Payment filed by Jay Shulman. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/18/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2009)
February 23, 2009 356 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 303 Motion to Modify Stipulated Injunction. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2009)
February 18, 2009 353 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF TENTATIVE RULING AND QUESTIONS FOR HEARING. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on February 18, 2009. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2009)
February 17, 2009 352 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO FILE EXHIBIT A TO MERRILL DECLARATION IN PUBLIC RECORD. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/17/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2009)
February 5, 2009 343 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SEALING. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on February 5, 2009. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2009)
February 3, 2009 341 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 336 Stipulation re Plaintiffs' Third Quarter 2008 Fees. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/3/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2009)
February 2, 2009 334 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER FOR PAYMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/2/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2009)
January 23, 2009 320 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE COMPENSATION OF COURT EXPERTS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on January 23, 2009. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2009)
January 21, 2009 317 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 316 Stipulation re Briefing Schedule for Plaintiffs' Joinder and Contempt Motions. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/21/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2009)
January 15, 2009 302 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re Transcription and Dictation Agreement. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on January 15, 2009. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2009)
January 9, 2009 300 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING 287 Motion for Payment. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2009)
January 8, 2009 296 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 295 Stipulation re Briefing and Hearing Schedule for Plaintiffs' Joinder and Contempt Motions. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/8/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2009)
December 16, 2008 290 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FURTHER MODIFYING AMENDED STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING COMPENSATION OF COURT EXPERT/REPRESENTATIVES. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 15, 2008. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2008)
December 1, 2008 284 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re Transition Planning Coordination Agreement. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 1, 2008. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2008)
November 20, 2008 280 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER MODIFYING REPORTING REQUIREMENTS. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton for Jeffrey S. White on November 19, 2008. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2008)
November 4, 2008 274 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING PAYMENT OF COURT REPRESENTATIVE INVOICE FOR SEPTEMBER 2008. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/4/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2008)
November 3, 2008 273 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE PAYMENT OF COURT REPRESENTATIVE INVOICES FOR SEPTEMBER 2008. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/3/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2008)
October 30, 2008 272 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/30/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2008)
October 22, 2008 268 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 267 Administrative Motion for an Extension of Time to Deposit Funds. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/22/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2008)
October 20, 2008 265 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING 239 Motion to Enforce Stipulated Injunction and Court Order re Experts. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2008)
October 15, 2008 261 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF TENTATIVE RULING AND QUESTIONS FOR HEARING SCHEDULED FOR OCTOBER 20, 2008. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/15/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2008)
October 7, 2008 250 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING SPACE COORDINATION AGREEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/7/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2008)
October 1, 2008 248 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 241 Administrative Motion to Continue Hearing and Enlarge Briefing Schedule and ADVANCING Hearing and Setting Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on October 1, 2008. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2008)
September 23, 2008 238 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Jeffry S. White on 9/23/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2008)
September 12, 2008 231 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re Expert Attendance At Monthly Meetings. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 12, 2008. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2008)
September 5, 2008 230 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER To Show Cause re: Space Coordination Agreement. Response due by September 26, 2008. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 5, 2008. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2008)
February 4, 2008 186 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on February 4, 2008. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez v. Tilton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?