Mai v. McGrath

Case Number: 3:2005cv05272
Filed: December 20, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 13, 2009 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 41 CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY; DIRECTIONS TO CLERK. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 13, 2009. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2009)
February 27, 2009 39 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Joe McGrath against Nhat D. Mai. The petition for a writ of habeas corpus is hereby DENIED. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2009)
February 26, 2009 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 26, 2009. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2009)
September 30, 2008 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 34 35 EXTENSION OF TIME. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 30, 2008. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mai v. McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?