Hells Angels Motorcycle Club - Richmond et al v. Contra Costa County Sheriff's Department et al Featured Case

Case Number: 3:2005cv05332
Filed: December 23, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Marilyn H. Patel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 16, 2006 26 Featured Case ORDER (NINETY-DAY CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL); Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 10/16/2006. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2006)
October 6, 2006 25 CERTIFICATION OF ENE Session dated 10/5/2006 by Evaluator, Amitai Schwartz; ENE session (proceeding as a mediation session) held 10/5/2006; Case settled; ADR process is complete. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2006)
September 13, 2006 24 CLERK'S NOTICE: Status Conference continued to 10/30/2006 03:00 PM; Joint Statement due by 10/23/2006. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2006)
September 7, 2006 23 STIPULATION and Proposed Order by Hells Angels Motorcycle Club - Richmond. (Gohel, Jai) (Filed on 9/7/2006)
September 1, 2006 Set/Reset Hearings: ENE Hearing (proceeding as MEDIATION session) set for 10/5/2006 at 09:30 AM. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2006)
August 11, 2006 22 CERTIFICATION OF ENE Session dated 8/8/2006 by Evaluator, Amitai Schwartz; ENE session held 8/8/2006; Second ENE session set for 9/27/2006; ENE process continues. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2006)
July 20, 2006 Set/Reset Hearings: ENE Hearing set for 8/8/2006 at 09:30 AM at the Evaluator's office. Written statements due no later than 5:00 PM on 8/2/2006. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2006)
May 15, 2006 Pre ENE phone conference rescheduled to 6/29/2006. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2006)
May 5, 2006 Evaluator will initiate the Pre ENE phone conference on 5/16/2006 at 4:30 p.m. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2006)
April 25, 2006 21 ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Amitai Schwartz as ENE Evaluator. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2006)
April 18, 2006 20 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 4/17/2006 before Judge Marilyn Hall Patel (Date Filed: 4/18/2006), Case referred to early neutral evaluation; Status Report due by 9/13/2006; Status Conference set for 9/18/2006 03:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (Court Reporter Juanita Gonzales.) (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/18/2006)
April 12, 2006 19 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER; Case referred to early neutral evaluation; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 4/12/2006. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2006)
April 11, 2006 18 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Early Neutral Evaluation by Hells Angels Motorcycle Club - Richmond, Hells Angels Motorcycle Club - Richmond (Gohel, Jai) (Filed on 4/11/2006)
April 11, 2006 17 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b) of discussion of ADR options (Gohel, Jai) (Filed on 4/11/2006)
April 10, 2006 16 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b) of discussion of ADR options (Knapp, Bernard) (Filed on 4/10/2006)
April 7, 2006 15 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2006)
April 3, 2006 14 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Hells Angels Motorcycle Club - Richmond. (Gohel, Jai) (Filed on 4/3/2006)
January 19, 2006 13 CLERK'S NOTICE: Case Management Conference set for 4/17/2006 04:00 PM before the honorable Marilyn Hall Patel; Case Management Statement due by 4/7/2006. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2006)
January 17, 2006 12 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Marilyn H. Patel for all further proceedings. Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case.Signed by Executive Committee on 1/17/06. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2006)
January 17, 2006 11 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2006)
January 12, 2006 10 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Todd Vernon and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge. (Gohel, Jai) (Filed on 1/12/2006)
January 12, 2006 9 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Hells Angels Motorcycle Club - Richmond and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge. (Gohel, Jai) (Filed on 1/12/2006)
January 12, 2006 8 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Shawn Frazer and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge. (Gohel, Jai) (Filed on 1/12/2006)
January 12, 2006 7 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Contra Costa County Sheriff's Department, Crockett Community Center.. (Knapp, Bernard) (Filed on 1/12/2006)
January 3, 2006 6 CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING the Initial Case Management Conference to 4/21/2006 at 1:30 PM. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/14/2006. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2006)
December 30, 2005 5 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANTS RE: Consent to Proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Form due by JAN. 13, 2006. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2005)
December 30, 2005 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Contra Costa County Sheriff's Department, Crockett Community Center (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Notice To Adverse Party Of Removal To Federal Court)(Knapp, Bernard) (Filed on 12/30/2005)
December 23, 2005 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2005)
December 23, 2005 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Contra Costa County Sheriff's Department, Crockett Community Center. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2005)
December 23, 2005 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 4/21/2006. Case Management Conference set for 4/28/2006 01:30 PM. (Attachments: # 1 CMC Standing Order# 2 Standing Order #2)(gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2005)
December 23, 2005 1 Answer to Removal Complaint byContra Costa County Sheriff's Department, Crockett Community Center. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2005) Modified on 12/28/2005 (gba, COURT STAFF).
December 23, 2005 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL; No Process from Contra Costa County Superior Court. Their case number is C05-02391. (Filing fee $250.00 receipt number 3379749). Filed byContra Costa County Sheriff's Department, Crockett Community Center. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2005)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hells Angels Motorcycle Club - Richmond et al v. Contra Costa County Sheriff's Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?