Apple Computer Inc. v. Burst.com, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff Apple Computer, Inc. sued defendant Burst.com, Inc. and sought a declaratory judgment that U.S. Patent Nos. 4,963,995 entitled \"Audio/Video Transceiver Apparatus Including Compression Means,\" 5,164,839 entitled \"Method for handling audio/video source information\", 5,995,705 entitled \"Burst transmission apparatus and method for audio/video information\" are invalid and are not infringed by Apple.

Plaintiff: Apple Inc.
Defendant: Burst.com, Inc.
Counter-defendant: Burst.com, Inc. and Apple Inc.
Counter-claimant: Apple Inc. and Burst.com, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2006cv00019
Filed: January 4, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Marilyn H. Patel
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 24, 2008 207 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 205 Motion to Relate Cases C 06-0019 MHP and C 08-0023 WDB (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2008)
January 10, 2008 206 STIPULATION re 205 MOTION to Relate Case ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 3-12 STIPULATION IN SUPPORT OF ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULES 3-12, 7-11 AND 7-12 by Realnetworks, Inc.. (Kramer, Robert) (Filed on 1/10/2008)
January 10, 2008 205 MOTION to Relate Case ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 3-12 filed by Realnetworks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kramer, Robert) (Filed on 1/10/2008)
December 5, 2007 204 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER dismissing all claims and counterclaims with prejudice; Each side to bear costs; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 12/4/2007. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2007)
December 3, 2007 203 STIPULATION and Order of Dismissal by Apple Inc., Burst.com, Inc.. (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 12/3/2007)
November 28, 2007 202 Featured Case ORDER (NINETY-DAY CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL); Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 11/27/2007. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2007)
November 21, 2007 201 MOTION Vacate Dates Due To Settlement (Joint) filed by Apple Inc., Burst.com, Inc.. (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 11/21/2007)
November 15, 2007 200 MOTION Clarification of Order on Motion to Change the Summary Judgment Schedule re 199 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,,,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR CLARIFICATION filed by Burst.com, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Change the Schedule# 2 Exhibit B Declaration of Spencer Hosie in Opposition to Apple's Motion to Change the Summary Judgment Schedule# 3 Proposed Order)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 11/15/2007)
November 15, 2007 199 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 197 plaintiff's Motion changing summary judgment schedules as follows: Motions to be filed by 11/21/2007; Oppositions to be filed by 12/12/2007; Replies to be filed by 12/28/2007;withdrawing 184 186 188 plaintiff's Motions for Summary Judgment without prejudice; (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2007)
November 12, 2007 198 Declaration of Nicholas A. Brown in Support of 197 MOTION to Change the Summary Judgment Schedule in Light of the Court's November 8, 2007 Order filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 197 ) (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 11/12/2007)
November 12, 2007 197 MOTION to Change the Summary Judgment Schedule in Light of the Court's November 8, 2007 Order filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 11/12/2007)
November 8, 2007 196 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting in part and denying in part plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment of invalidity (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2007)
October 31, 2007 195 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 192 plaintiff's Motion to Seal Documents in connection with Apple's partial motion for summary judgment re Latches and Invalidity (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2007)
October 30, 2007 194 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff Apple Computer, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment of Invalidity For Indefiniteness or in the Alternative For Lack of Written Description by Apple Inc.. (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 10/30/2007)
October 29, 2007 193 Declaration of Nicholas A. Brown in Support of 192 MOTION to Seal Document filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 192 ) (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 10/29/2007)
October 29, 2007 192 MOTION to Seal Document filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 10/29/2007)
October 29, 2007 191 Declaration of Stephen Wicker in Support of 186 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Based on Lack of Enablement filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 186 ) (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 10/29/2007)
October 29, 2007 190 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of 184 186] 188 by Apple Inc. (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 10/29/2007) Modified on 10/30/2007 (gba, COURT STAFF).
October 29, 2007 189 Declaration of Leeron G. Kalay in Support of 188 Apple's Motion For Partial Summary Judgment of Laches filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3a# 4 Exhibit 3b# 5 Exhibit 4# 6 Exhibit 5# 7 Exhibit 6# 8 Exhibit 7# 9 Exhibit 8# 10 Exhibit 9# 11 Exhibit 10# 12 Exhibit 11# 13 Exhibit 12# 14 Exhibit 13# 15 Exhibit 14# 16 Exhibit 15# 17 Exhibit 16# 18 Exhibit 17# 19 Exhibit 18# 20 Exhibit 19# 21 Exhibit 20# 22 Exhibit 21# 23 Exhibit 22# 24 Exhibit 23# 25 Exhibit 24# 26 Exhibit 25# 27 Exhibit 26# 28 Exhibit 27# 29 Exhibit 28# 30 Exhibit 29)(Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 10/29/2007) Modified on 10/30/2007 (gba, COURT STAFF).
October 29, 2007 188 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Laches filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2007 02:00 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 10/29/2007) Modified on 10/30/2007 (gba, COURT STAFF).
October 29, 2007 187 Declaration of Nicholas V. Martini in Support of 186 Plaintiff Apple's Motion For Summary Judgment of Invalidity Based on Lack of Enablement filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit 10# 11 Exhibit 11# 12 Exhibit 12# 13 Exhibit 14# 14 Exhibit 15# 15 Exhibit 16# 16 Exhibit 17# 17 Exhibit 18# 18 Exhibit 19# 19 Exhibit 20# 20 Exhibit 21# 21 Exhibit 22# 22 Exhibit 23)(Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 10/29/2007) Modified on 10/30/2007 (gba, COURT STAFF).
October 29, 2007 186 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Based on Lack of Enablement filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2007 02:00 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 10/29/2007)
October 29, 2007 185 Declaration of Jennifer H. Wu in Support of 184 Apple's Motion For Summary Judgment of Invalidity For Indefiniteness or in the Alternative For Lack of Written Description filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3)(Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 10/29/2007) Modified on 10/30/2007 (gba, COURT STAFF).
October 29, 2007 184 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity For Indefiniteness or in the Alternative For Lack of Written Description filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2007 02:00 PM. (Attachments: *** # 1 Proposed Order FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 194 . *** )(Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 10/29/2007) Modified on 10/30/2007 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
October 16, 2007 183 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER modifying pretrial briefing schedules; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 10/15/2007. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2007)
October 12, 2007 182 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 178 plaintiff's Motion for attorney Elizabeth Stotland Weiswasser to appear Pro Hac Vice (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2007)
October 12, 2007 181 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 177 plaintiff's Motion for attorney Jennifer H Wu to appear Pro Hac Vice (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2007)
October 12, 2007 180 STIPULATION Stipulated Request for An Order Changing Time by Apple Inc., Burst.com, Inc.. (Crosby, Ian) (Filed on 10/12/2007)
October 9, 2007 179 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM 171 Answer to to CounterClaim,, Counterclaim, Burst.com, Inc.'s, Answer to Apple Computer, Inc.'s Amended Counterclaim for Declaratory Judgment byBurst.com, Inc.. (Crosby, Ian) (Filed on 10/9/2007)
October 4, 2007 Received Order re 178 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 34611011181) by Apple Inc. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2007)
October 4, 2007 178 MOTION for Admission of Attorney Elizabeth Stotland Weiswasser Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 34611011181) filed by Apple Inc.. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2007)
October 4, 2007 Received Order re 177 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 34611011182) by Apple Inc. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2007)
October 4, 2007 177 MOTION for Admission of Attorney Jennifer H. Wu Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 34611011182) filed by Apple Inc. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2007)
October 4, 2007 176 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to and including 10/9/2007 for defendnat to filed answer to plaintiff's amended answer to defendant's amended counterclaim; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 10/3/2007. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2007)
October 1, 2007 175 STIPULATION Stipulated Request for Order Changing Time by Burst.com, Inc., Apple Inc.. (Crosby, Ian) (Filed on 10/1/2007)
September 26, 2007 174 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/18/07 before Judge Marilyn H. Patel. Court Reporter: Sahar McVickar. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2007)
September 20, 2007 173 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER allowing plaintiff to file amended answer; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 9/20/2007. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2007)
September 20, 2007 172 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 166 plaintiff's Motion to Seal exhibits C and D to the declaration of Nicholas A Brown in support of plaintiff's motion to strike declaration (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2007)
September 19, 2007 171 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM Apple Computer, Inc.'s Amended Answer to Burst.com, Inc.'s Amended Counterclaim and Counterclaim For Declaratory Judgment, COUNTERCLAIM against all defendants byApple Inc.. (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 9/19/2007)
September 19, 2007 170 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation Allowing Apple to File an Amended Answer by Apple Inc., Burst.com, Inc.. (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 9/19/2007)
September 19, 2007 169 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 9/18/2007 before Hon. Marilyn Hall Patel (Date Filed: 9/19/2007) re motions for summary judgment on invalidity (Court Reporter Sahar McVicker.) (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/19/2007)
September 17, 2007 168 Proposed Order re 164 MOTION to Strike 146 Declaration in Opposition, 150 Declaration in Opposition, 147 Declaration in Opposition MOTION to Strike 146 Declaration in Opposition, 150 Declaration in Opposition, 147 Declaration in Opposition by Apple Inc.. (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 9/17/2007)
September 17, 2007 167 Declaration of Leeron G. Kalay in Support of 166 MOTION to Seal Document 165 Declaration in Support, filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 166 ) (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 9/17/2007)
September 17, 2007 166 MOTION to Seal Document 165 Declaration in Support, filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 9/17/2007)
September 17, 2007 165 Declaration of Nicholas Brown in Support of 164 MOTION to Strike 146 Declaration in Opposition, 150 Declaration in Opposition, 147 Declaration in Opposition MOTION to Strike 146 Declaration in Opposition, 150 Declaration in Opposition, 147 Declaration in Opposition filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 164 ) (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 9/17/2007)
September 17, 2007 164 MOTION to Strike 146 Declaration in Opposition, 150 Declaration in Opposition, 147 Declaration in Opposition filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/18/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 9/17/2007)
September 12, 2007 163 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 162 Motion to allow equipment into courtroom for 9/18/2007; (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2007)
September 10, 2007 162 MOTION Request to Bring Certain Equipment into Courthouse for Purposes of Hearing on Summary Judgment Motion filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 9/10/2007)
September 10, 2007 161 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 158 plaintiff's Motion to Seal exhibits D, O of declaration Nicholas A Brown in support of reply in support of second motion for summary judgment;(awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2007)
September 7, 2007 Received Document Exhibits D and O to the Declaration of Nicholas A. Brown requested to be filed under seal by Apple Inc.(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2007)
September 6, 2007 160 Proposed Order re 158 MOTION to Seal Document Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-10 and 79-5 by Apple Inc.. (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 9/6/2007)
September 6, 2007 159 Declaration of Leeron G. Kalay in Support of 158 MOTION to Seal Document Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-10 and 79-5 filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 158 ) (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 9/6/2007)
September 6, 2007 158 MOTION to Seal Document Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-10 and 79-5 filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/18/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 9/6/2007)
September 6, 2007 157 Declaration of Nicholas A. Brown in Support of 156 Reply Memorandum filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A part 1# 2 Exhibit A part 2# 3 Exhibit A part 3# 4 Exhibit A part 4# 5 Exhibit A part 5# 6 Exhibit B part 1# 7 Exhibit B part 2# 8 Exhibit B part 3# 9 Exhibit C# 10 Exhibit D# 11 Exhibit E# 12 Exhibit F# 13 Exhibit G# 14 Exhibit H# 15 Exhibit I# 16 Exhibit J# 17 Exhibit K# 18 Exhibit L# 19 Exhibit M# 20 Exhibit N# 21 Exhibit O)(Related document(s) 156 ) (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 9/6/2007) Modified on 9/18/2007 (gba, COURT STAFF).
September 6, 2007 156 Reply Memorandum re 124 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed byApple Inc.. (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 9/6/2007)
August 30, 2007 155 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 124 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity **Corrected Version** filed byBurst.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A)(Related document(s) 124 ) (Wecker, Bruce) (Filed on 8/30/2007)
August 30, 2007 154 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting in part and denying in part 144 Motion to Seal; All documents listed except the referenced opposition; Pleadings, briefs, memorandua and not to be filed under seal. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2007)
August 29, 2007 153 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 124 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Defendant Burst.com, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff Apple Computer, Inc.'s Second Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed byBurst.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A)(Related document(s) 124 ) (Wecker, Bruce) (Filed on 8/29/2007)
August 28, 2007 152 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Burst.com, Inc. re Defendant Burst.com, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff Apple Computer, Inc.'s Second Motion for Summary Judgment on Invalidity (and supporting documents) (Wecker, Bruce) (Filed on 8/28/2007)
August 28, 2007 151 DECLARATION of Daniel J. Walker in Opposition to Apple Computer, Inc.'s Second Motion for Summary Judgment filed byBurst.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit 10# 11 Exhibit 11# 12 Exhibit 12# 13 Exhibit 13# 14 Exhibit 14# 15 Exhibit 15# 16 Exhibit 16# 17 Exhibit 17# 18 Exhibit 18# 19 Exhibit 19# 20 Exhibit 20# 21 Exhibit 21# 22 Exhibit 22# 23 Exhibit 23# 24 Exhibit 24# 25 Exhibit 25# 26 Exhibit 26# 27 Exhibit 27# 28 Exhibit 28# 29 Exhibit 29)(Wecker, Bruce) (Filed on 8/28/2007)
August 28, 2007 150 DECLARATION of Richard Lang in Opposition to Second Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed byBurst.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit 10# 11 Exhibit 11# 12 Exhibit 12)(Wecker, Bruce) (Filed on 8/28/2007)
August 28, 2007 149 DECLARATION of Dr. Justin Douglas Tygar in Opposition to Apple's Second Motioin for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed byBurst.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Wecker, Bruce) (Filed on 8/28/2007)
August 28, 2007 148 DECLARATION of Bruce McFarlane in Opposition to Plaintiff Apple Computer, Inc.'s Second Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed byBurst.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A# 2 Appendix B)(Wecker, Bruce) (Filed on 8/28/2007)
August 28, 2007 147 DECLARATION of Allen Gersho in Opposition to Apple's Second Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed byBurst.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Wecker, Bruce) (Filed on 8/28/2007)
August 28, 2007 146 DECLARATION of Dr. Sheila Hemami in Opposition to Apple's Second Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed byBurst.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3)(Wecker, Bruce) (Filed on 8/28/2007)
August 28, 2007 145 Declaration of Bruce Wecker in Support of 144 MOTION to Seal Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-10 and 79-5 filed byBurst.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 144 ) (Wecker, Bruce) (Filed on 8/28/2007)
August 28, 2007 144 MOTION to Seal Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-10 and 79-5 filed by Burst.com, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/18/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wecker, Bruce) (Filed on 8/28/2007)
August 28, 2007 143 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME AS AGREED TO, AND DENYING REQUEST FOR PAGE LIMIT EXTENSION; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 8/28/2007. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2007)
August 24, 2007 142 Declaration of Nicholas A. Brown In Support of Stipulation Extending Deadlines filed byApple Inc.. (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 8/24/2007)
August 24, 2007 141 STIPULATION re 124 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity and [Proposed] Order Granting Administrative Request to Exceed Page Limitations Governing Burst's Opposition to Apple's Second Motion For Summary Judgement of Invalidity and Extend Deadline For Apple's Reply by Apple Inc., Burst.com, Inc.. (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 8/24/2007)
August 16, 2007 140 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER resetting hearing on motions for summary judgment to 9/18/2007 02:00 PM; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 8/10/2007. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2007)
August 9, 2007 139 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Continuing Hearing On Apple's First And Second Motions For Summary Judgment of Invalidity by Apple Inc.. (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 8/9/2007)
July 20, 2007 137 Featured Case ORDER RESETTING HEARINGS on Motion 92 MOTION for Summary Judgment OF INVALIDITY BASED ON KRAMER AND AT&T PATENTS, 124 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity 119 MOTION to Strike the Declarations of Drs. Hemami and Gersho TO 9/12/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 7/20/2007. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2007)
July 20, 2007 136 Featured Case ORDER granting defendant's application for attorney Eric J Fager to appear pro hac vice; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 7/19/2007. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2007)
July 18, 2007 138 MOTION for attorney Eric J. Enger leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611008524.) filed by Burst.com, Inc.. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2007)
July 17, 2007 135 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 129 parties' Motion to bring equipment for use in summary judgment motion hearing on 7/25/2007 (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2007)
July 16, 2007 134 Declaration of DANIEL J. WALKER IN SUPPORT OF BURST.COM INC.'S OPPOSITION TO APPLE COMPUTER, INC.'S MOTION TO STRIKE THE DECLARATIONS OF DRS. HEMAMI AND GERSHO in Support of 133 Memorandum in Opposition filed byBurst.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-3)(Related document(s) 133 ) (Short, Floyd) (Filed on 7/16/2007)
July 16, 2007 133 Memorandum in Opposition re 119 MOTION to Strike the Declarations of Drs. Hemami and Gersho filed byBurst.com, Inc.. (Short, Floyd) (Filed on 7/16/2007)
July 16, 2007 132 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing: Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment re Invalidity Hearing reset for 7/25/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2007)
July 13, 2007 131 Appendix re 124 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity (B: Gremillet & Tescher Claim Chart) filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 124 ) (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 7/13/2007)
July 13, 2007 130 Appendix re 124 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity (A: Walter Claim Chart) filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 124 ) (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 7/13/2007)
July 13, 2007 129 MOTION TO BRING INTO THE FEDERAL COURTHOUSE CERTAIN EQUIPMENT AND MATERIALS FOR PURPOSES OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ARGUMENT filed by Apple Inc., Burst.com, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/19/2007 02:30 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Grewe, Christopher) (Filed on 7/13/2007)
July 13, 2007 128 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. (Martini, Nicholas) (Filed on 7/13/2007)
July 13, 2007 127 MOTION re 125 Declaration in Support, filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 # 2)(Martini, Nicholas) (Filed on 7/13/2007)
July 13, 2007 126 Declaration of Dr. Stephen B. Wicker in Support of 124 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 124 ) (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 7/13/2007)
July 13, 2007 125 Declaration of Leeron Kalay in Support of 124 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J# 11 Exhibit K# 12 Exhibit L)(Related document(s) 124 ) (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 7/13/2007)
July 13, 2007 124 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/10/2007 02:00 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 7/13/2007)
July 11, 2007 123 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 121 defendant's Motion for attorney Daniel J Walker to appear Pro Hac Vice (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2007)
July 6, 2007 122 STIPULATION re 119 MOTION to Strike the Declarations of Drs. Hemami and Gersho and [Proposed] Order by Apple Inc.. (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 7/6/2007)
July 3, 2007 Received Order re 121 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 34611008004) by Burst.com, Inc.. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2007)
July 3, 2007 121 MOTION for Admission of Attorney Daniel J. Walker Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 34611008004) filed by Burst.com, Inc. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2007)
July 3, 2007 120 Declaration of Nicholas A. Brown in Support of 119 MOTION to Strike the Declarations of Drs. Hemami and Gersho filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 119 ) (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 7/3/2007)
July 3, 2007 119 MOTION to Strike the Declarations of Drs. Hemami and Gersho filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 7/3/2007)
June 22, 2007 118 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER REVISING SCHEDULING ORDER; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 6/21/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement)(awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2007)
June 22, 2007 117 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting request for increase page limit for filing of reply brief (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2007)
June 21, 2007 116 Declaration of Leeron Kalay in Support of 115 Reply Memorandum In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F)(Related document(s) 115 ) (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 6/21/2007)
June 21, 2007 115 Reply Memorandum re 92 MOTION for Summary Judgment OF INVALIDITY BASED ON KRAMER AND AT&T PATENTS filed byApple Inc.. (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 6/21/2007)
June 20, 2007 114 STIPULATION re 113 MOTION Increase Page Limit of its Reply Brief For its Motion For Summary Judgment of Invalidity by Apple Inc. (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 6/20/2007) Modified on 6/22/2007 (gba, COURT STAFF).
June 20, 2007 113 MOTION to Increase Page Limit of its Reply Brief For its Motion For Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed by Apple Inc.. (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 6/20/2007) Modified on 6/22/2007 (gba, COURT STAFF).
June 8, 2007 112 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Revised Scheduling Order by Burst.com, Inc.. (Payne, Leslie) (Filed on 6/8/2007)
June 8, 2007 111 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing: Plaintiff's Motion for Suumary Judgment re validity 92 set for 7/19/2007 02:30 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2007)
June 7, 2007 110 Declaration of Ian Crosby in Support of 107 Response Burst.com, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff Apple Computer, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment on Invalidity Based on Kramer and Kepley Patents filed byBurst.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to I. Crosby Declaration# 2 Exhibit 2 to I. Crosby Declaration# 3 Exhibit 3 to I. Crosby Declaration# 4 Exhibit 4 to I. Crosby Declaration)(Related document(s) 107 ) (Crosby, Ian) (Filed on 6/7/2007)
June 7, 2007 109 Declaration of Sheila Hemami in Support of 107 Response Burst.com, Inc's Opposition to Plaintiff Apple Computer, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment on Invalidity Based on Kramer and Kepley Patents filed byBurst.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to S. Hemami Declaration# 2 Exhibit B to S. Hemami Declaration# 3 Exhibit C to S. Hemami Declaration# 4 Exhibit D to S. Hemami Declaration# 5 Exhibit E to S. Hemami Declaration# 6 Exhibit F to S. Hemami Declaration# 7 Exhibit G to S. Hemami Declaration# 8 Exhibit H to S. Hemami Declaration# 9 Exhibit I to S. Hemami Declaration# 10 Exhibit J to S. Hemami Declaration# 11 Exhibit K to S. Hemami Declaration)(Related document(s) 107 ) (Crosby, Ian) (Filed on 6/7/2007)
June 7, 2007 108 Declaration of Allen gersho in Support of 107 Response of Burst.com, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff Apple Computer, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment on Invalidity Based on Kramer and Kepley Patents filed byBurst.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to A. Gersho Declaration# 2 Exhibit B to A. Gersho Declaration# 3 Exhibit C to A. Gersho Declaration# 4 Exhibit D to A. Gersho Declaration# 5 Exhibit E to A. Gersho Declaration# 6 Exhibit F to A. Gersho Declaration (Part 1)# 7 Exhibit F to A. Gersho Declaration (Part 2)# 8 Exhibit G to A. Gersho Declaration# 9 Exhibit H to A. Gersho Declaration# 10 Exhibit I to A. Gersho Declaration (Part 1)# 11 Exhibit I to A. Gersho Declaration (Part 2)# 12 Exhibit J to A. Gersho Declaration# 13 Exhibit K to A. Gersho Declaration# 14 Exhibit L to A. Gersho Declaration# 15 Exhibit M to A. Gersho Declaration# 16 Exhibit N to A. Gersho Declaration# 17 Exhibit O to A. Gersho Declaration)(Related document(s) 107 ) (Crosby, Ian) (Filed on 6/7/2007)
June 7, 2007 107 Opposition to 92 Plaintiff Apple Computer, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment on Invalidity Based on Kramer and Kepley Patents byBurst.com, Inc.. (Crosby, Ian) (Filed on 6/7/2007) Modified on 6/18/2007 (gba, COURT STAFF).
June 6, 2007 106 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel withdrawing 88 plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment re Non-Infringment without prejudice (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2007)
June 5, 2007 105 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re 88 MOTION for Summary Judgment OF NONINFRINGEMENT OF THE "STORED TIME COMPRESSED REPRESENTATION" LIMITATION Notice of Withdrawal of Motion For Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 6/5/2007)
May 8, 2007 104 Featured Case CLAIM CONSTRUCTION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR US PATENT NOS 4,963,995; 5,164,839; 5,057,932 AND 5,995,705; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 5/8/2007. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2007)
March 9, 2007 103 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 2/8/07 before Judge Marilyn H. Patel. Court Reporter: James Yeomans. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2007)
February 9, 2007 102 Minute Entry: Claims Construction Hearing held on 2/8/2007 before Judge Marilyn Hall Patel. Defendant may respond to the document submitted to the Court during Mr. Stephens' presentation. Defendant is to respond to plaintiff's summary judgment motions within 30 days of the date of the filing of the Court's Order re: Claim Construction. Plaintiff is to reply within 2 weeks thereafter. The matter will be set for a hearing at 2:00 p.m on a date other than the court's standard Monday civil Law and Motions calendar. (Court Reporter Jim Yeomans.) (epb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/9/2007)
February 7, 2007 101 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 2/1/07 before Judge Marilyn H. Patel. Court Reporter: James Yeomans. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2007)
February 1, 2007 100 Minute Entry: Tutorial Hearing held on 2/1/2007 before Judge Marilyn Hall Patel (Date Filed: 2/1/2007). Claim construction hearing remains on the Court's calendar for 2/8/07, 9:00 a.m. Parties directed to confer and come to an agreement on the order of presentation of issues. Parties' experts should be present and available for the hearing. (Court Reporter Jim Yeomans.) (epb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/1/2007)
January 30, 2007 99 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 98 Motion re: Request to Bring into Courthouse Equipment and Materials. Parties to coordinate with Courtroom Deputy Butler (415) 522-3018. Signed by by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel 1/29/07. (epb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2007)
January 26, 2007 98 MOTION TO BRING INTO THE FEDERAL COURTHOUSE CERTAIN EQUIPMENT AND MATERIALS FOR PURPOSES OF A TUTORIAL AND CLAIM CONSTRUCTION HEARING filed by Apple Computer Inc., Burst.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 1/26/2007)
January 25, 2007 97 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT Joint Claim Construction Chart Grouped by Term filed by Burst.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Howe, Micah) (Filed on 1/25/2007)
January 16, 2007 96 CLERK'S NOTICE - Hearing re: plaintiff's motions for summary judgment, previously set for 2/8/07 at 9:00 a.m., in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco, is VACATED. The claim construction hearing REMAINS SET for 2/8/07 at 9:00 a.m. Hearing date for summary judgment motions will be set by the court at the 2/8/07 claim construction hearing, as well as the briefing schedule. (epb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2007)
January 11, 2007 95 Memorandum in Opposition re 94 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Defendant and Counterclaimant Burst.com, Inc.'s Motion to Enlarge Time Within Which to Respond to Apple Computer, Inc.'s Motions for Summary Judgment filed byApple Computer Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 1/11/2007)
January 8, 2007 94 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Defendant and Counterclaimant Burst.com, Inc.'s Motion to Enlarge Time Within Which to Respond to Apple Computer, Inc.'s Motions for Summary Judgment filed by Burst.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Robert J. Yorio# 2 Proposed Order)(Yorio, Robert) (Filed on 1/8/2007)
January 4, 2007 93 Declaration of Nicholas A. Brown in Support of 92 MOTION for Summary Judgment OF INVALIDITY BASED ON KRAMER AND AT&T PATENTS filed byApple Computer Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7)(Related document(s) 92 ) (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 1/4/2007)
January 4, 2007 92 MOTION for Summary Judgment OF INVALIDITY BASED ON KRAMER AND AT&T PATENTS filed by Apple Computer Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/8/2007 09:00 AM. (Attachments: # 1)(Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 1/4/2007)
January 4, 2007 91 MOTION to Seal Document 90 Declaration in Support, filed by Apple Computer Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 # 2)(Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 1/4/2007)
January 4, 2007 90 Declaration of Leeron G. Kalay in Support of 88 MOTION for Summary Judgment OF NONINFRINGEMENT OF THE "STORED TIME COMPRESSED REPRESENTATION" LIMITATION filed byApple Computer Inc.. (Related document(s) 88 ) (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 1/4/2007)
January 4, 2007 89 Declaration in Support of 88 MOTION for Summary Judgment OF NONINFRINGEMENT OF THE "STORED TIME COMPRESSED REPRESENTATION" LIMITATION filed byApple Computer Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 4# 2 Exhibit 5# 3 Exhibit 6 Part 1# 4 Exhibit 6 Part 2# 5 Exhibit 6 Part 3# 6 Exhibit 6 Part 4# 7 Exhibit Part 5)(Related document(s) 88 ) (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 1/4/2007)
January 4, 2007 88 MOTION for Summary Judgment OF NONINFRINGEMENT OF THE "STORED TIME COMPRESSED REPRESENTATION" LIMITATION filed by Apple Computer Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/8/2007 09:00 AM. (Attachments: # 1)(Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 1/4/2007)
December 22, 2006 87 *** CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 86 *** Declaration of Leslie Payne in Support of Burst.com, Inc.'s Reply Brief on Claim Construction filed byBurst.com, Inc., Burst.com, Inc., Burst.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. 27# 2 Exhibit Ex. 28# 3 Exhibit Ex. 29# 4 Exhibit Ex. 30# 5 Exhibit Ex. 31# 6 Exhibit Ex. 32# 7 Errata 33# 8 Exhibit Ex. 34-1# 9 Exhibit Ex. 34-2# 10 Exhibit Ex. 35# 11 Exhibit Ex. 36# 12 Exhibit Ex. 37# 13 Exhibit Ex. 38)(Short, Floyd) (Filed on 12/22/2006) Modified on 12/27/2006 (wv, COURT STAFF).
December 22, 2006 86 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 87 *** Declaration of Les Payne in Support of Burst's Reply Brief on Claim Construction filed byBurst.com, Inc., Burst.com, Inc., Burst.com, Inc.. (Short, Floyd) (Filed on 12/22/2006) Modified on 12/27/2006 (wv, COURT STAFF).
December 22, 2006 85 Reply Memorandum on Claim Construction filed byBurst.com, Inc., Burst.com, Inc., Burst.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Brief pages 36-73)(Short, Floyd) (Filed on 12/22/2006)
December 15, 2006 84 Featured Case ORDER re: 80 MOTION to Seal Document. Exhibits A, B, C, D to Kalay Declaration to be filed under seal. Motions terminated: Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 12/12/06. (epb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2006)
December 11, 2006 83 EXHIBITS re 74 Declaration in Support, Exhibit DD filed byApple Computer Inc.. (Related document(s) 74 ) (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 12/11/2006)
December 11, 2006 82 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Computer Inc. re 71 Claim Construction Statement & Motion to Seal Document Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-10 & 79-5 (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 12/11/2006)
December 9, 2006 81 Declaration in Support of 80 MOTION to Seal Document Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-10 and 79-5 filed byApple Computer Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 80 ) (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 12/9/2006)
December 9, 2006 80 MOTION to Seal Document Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-10 and 79-5 filed by Apple Computer Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 12/9/2006)
December 9, 2006 79 EXHIBITS re 74 Declaration in Support, filed byApple Computer Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit L Part 1# 2 Exhibit L Part 2# 3 Exhibit L Part 3# 4 Exhibit L Part 4# 5 Exhibit L Part 5# 6 Exhibit L Part 6# 7 Exhibit L Part 7# 8 Exhibit L Part 8)(Related document(s) 74 ) (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 12/9/2006)
December 9, 2006 78 EXHIBITS re 74 Declaration in Support, filed byApple Computer Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit AA Part 1# 2 Exhibit AA Part 2# 3 Exhibit AA Part 3# 4 Exhibit BB# 5 Exhibit CC)(Related document(s) 74 ) (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 12/9/2006)
December 9, 2006 77 EXHIBITS re 74 Declaration in Support, filed byApple Computer Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit R# 2 Exhibit S# 3 Exhibit T# 4 Exhibit U# 5 Exhibit V# 6 Exhibit W# 7 Exhibit X Part 1# 8 Exhibit X Part 2# 9 Exhibit Y# 10 Exhibit Z)(Related document(s) 74 ) (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 12/9/2006)
December 9, 2006 76 EXHIBITS M-Q filed byApple Computer Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit M# 2 Exhibit N# 3 Exhibit O Part 1# 4 Exhibit O Part 2# 5 Exhibit O Part 3# 6 Exhibit O Part 4# 7 Exhibit P# 8 Exhibit Q Part 1# 9 Exhibit Q Part 2# 10 Exhibit Q Part 3)(Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 12/9/2006)
December 9, 2006 75 EXHIBITS re 74 Declaration in Support, filed byApple Computer Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C Part 1# 2 Exhibit C Part 2# 3 Exhibit C Part 3# 4 Exhibit C Part 4# 5 Exhibit D Part 1# 6 Exhibit D Part 2# 7 Exhibit E# 8 Exhibit F# 9 Exhibit G# 10 Exhibit H# 11 Exhibit I# 12 Exhibit J# 13 Exhibit K)(Related document(s) 74 ) (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 12/9/2006)
December 9, 2006 74 Declaration of Nicholas Brown filed byApple Computer Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A Part 1# 2 Exhibit Exhibit A Part 2# 3 Exhibit Exhibit A Part 3# 4 Exhibit Exhibit A Part 4# 5 Exhibit Exhibit B Part 1# 6 Exhibit Exhibit B Part# 7 Exhibit Exhibit B Part 3# 8 Exhibit Exhibit B Part 4)(Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 12/9/2006)
December 9, 2006 73 Declaration of Leeron Kalay in Support of 71 Claim Construction Statement filed byApple Computer Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 71 ) (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 12/9/2006)
December 9, 2006 72 Declaration of Joel Halpern in Support of 71 Claim Construction Statement filed byApple Computer Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Part 1# 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Part 2)(Related document(s) 71 ) (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 12/9/2006)
December 8, 2006 71 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT filed by Apple Computer Inc., Apple Computer Inc.. (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 12/8/2006)
November 22, 2006 70 EXHIBITS re 68 Declaration in Support, Exhibit 18 filed byBurst.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 19# 2 Exhibit 20# 3 Exhibit 21# 4 Exhibit 22# 5 Exhibit 23# 6 Exhibit 24# 7 Exhibit 25# 8 Exhibit 26)(Related document(s) 68 ) (Payne, Leslie) (Filed on 11/22/2006)
November 22, 2006 69 EXHIBITS re 68 Declaration in Support, Exhibit 8 filed byBurst.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 9# 2 Exhibit 10# 3 Exhibit 11# 4 Exhibit 12# 5 Exhibit 13# 6 Exhibit 14# 7 Exhibit 16# 8 Exhibit 17)(Related document(s) 68 ) (Payne, Leslie) (Filed on 11/22/2006)
November 22, 2006 68 Declaration of Leslie V. Payne in Support of 66 Brief Defendant Burst.com, Inc.'s Opening Brief on Claim Construction filed byBurst.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7)(Related document(s) 66 ) (Payne, Leslie) (Filed on 11/22/2006)
November 22, 2006 67 Declaration of Dr. Sheila S. Hemami in Support of 66 Brief Defendant Burst.com, Inc.'s Opening Brief on Claim Construction filed byBurst.com, Inc.. (Related document(s) 66 ) (Payne, Leslie) (Filed on 11/22/2006)
November 22, 2006 66 Brief Defendant Burst.com, Inc.'s Opening Brief on Claim Construction filed byBurst.com, Inc.. (Payne, Leslie) (Filed on 11/22/2006)
November 6, 2006 64 Featured Case STIPULATION AND SUPPLEMENTAL PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING DISCLOSURE OF CONFIDENTIAL SOURCE CODE. Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 10/27/06. (Attachments: # 1 Order Approving and Modifying Stipulated Protective Order, Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 11/3/06)(epb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2006)
November 3, 2006 65 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/10/06 before Judge Marilyn H. Patel. Court Reporter: Katherine A. Powell. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2006)
October 26, 2006 63 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Supplemental Protective Order Regarding Disclosure of Confidential Source Code by Burst.com, Inc.. (Short, Floyd) (Filed on 10/26/2006)
October 11, 2006 62 Minute Entry: Pre-Claims Construction Hearing held on 10/10/2006 before Hon. Marilyn Hall Patel (Date Filed: 10/11/2006). (Court Reporter Katherine Powell.) (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/11/2006)
October 6, 2006 61 Declaration of Brian Bershad filed byBurst.com, Inc.. (Short, Floyd) (Filed on 10/6/2006)
October 6, 2006 60 Declaration of Lou Brucculeri Re: Brian Bershad filed byApple Computer Inc.. (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 10/6/2006)
October 3, 2006 59 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT (JOINT) filed by Apple Computer Inc., Apple Computer Inc., Apple Computer Inc., Apple Computer Inc., Apple Computer Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Agreed Constructions# 2 Exhibit B - '995 Patent# 3 Exhibit C - '839 Patent# 4 Exhibit D - '932 Patent# 5 Exhibit E - '705 Patent)(Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 10/3/2006)
September 26, 2006 58 Featured Case STIPULATION AND CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Tutorial set for 2/1/2007 at 9:00 AM; Claims Construction Hearing set for 2/8/2207 09:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 2/26/2008 08:30 AM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco; Pretrial Conference set for 2/13/2008 02:30 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 9/26/2006. (Attachments: # 1)(awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2006)
September 15, 2006 57 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Protective Order Regarding Disclosure of Confidential Materials by Burst.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Short, Floyd) (Filed on 9/15/2006)
September 11, 2006 56 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Case Management Order by Apple Computer Inc., Burst.com, Inc.. (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 9/11/2006)
June 7, 2006 55 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM 52 Answer to to CounterClaim, Counterclaim Burst's Answer to Apple's Counterclaim Regarding U.S. Patent No. 5,057,932 byBurst.com, Inc.. (Short, Floyd) (Filed on 6/7/2006)
May 23, 2006 53 Featured Case ORDER granting defendant's motion for attorney John M. Neukom to appear pro hac vice; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 5/22/2006. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2006)
May 22, 2006 Received Order re 54 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Burst.com, Inc. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2006)
May 22, 2006 54 MOTION for Admission of Attorney John M. Neukom Pro Hac Vice (Fee paid $210.00) filed by Burst.com, Inc. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2006)
May 18, 2006 52 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM, First COUNTERCLAIM against Burst.com, Inc., Burst.com, Inc., Burst.com, Inc. byApple Computer Inc., Apple Computer Inc., Apple Computer Inc.. (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 5/18/2006)
May 16, 2006 51 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to 5/11/2006 for plaintiff to file a responsive pleading to amended answer and counterclaim; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 5/15/2006. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2006)
May 11, 2006 50 Declaration in Support of 49 Stipulation, TO EXTEND TIME FOR PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S AMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS filed byApple Computer Inc., Apple Computer Inc., Apple Computer Inc.. (Related document(s) 49 ) (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 5/11/2006)
May 11, 2006 49 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S AMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS by Burst.com, Inc., Apple Computer Inc., Apple Computer Inc., Burst.com, Inc., Burst.com, Inc., Apple Computer Inc.. (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 5/11/2006)
May 10, 2006 48 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 46 plaintiff's Motion for attorney Garland T. Stephens to appear Pro Hac Vice (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2006)
May 9, 2006 45 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 5/8/2006 before Judge Marilyn Hall Patel (Date Filed: 5/9/2006); Claims Construction Hearing set for 2/8/2007 09:00 AM; Pre-Claim Construction Conference set for 10/10/2006 03:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco; Tutorial Hearing set for 1/31/2007 02:00 PM; (Court Reporter Sahar McVickar.) (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/9/2006)
May 8, 2006 47 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Computer Inc. re 46 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, Received Order (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2006)
May 8, 2006 Received Order re 46 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Apple Computer Inc. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2006)
May 8, 2006 46 MOTION for Admission of Attorney Garland T. Stephens to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Fee $210.00, Receipt Number 3385338) filed by Apple Computer Inc. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2006)
May 1, 2006 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Spencer Hosie for Burst.com, Inc. (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 5/1/2006)
April 28, 2006 43 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT & Proposed Order filed by Apple Computer Inc., Burst.com, Inc.. (Short, Floyd) (Filed on 4/28/2006)
April 27, 2006 42 AMENDED ANSWER to Apple's Complaint for Declaratory Judgment, Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Apple Computer Inc. byBurst.com, Inc.. (Short, Floyd) (Filed on 4/27/2006)
April 27, 2006 41 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 26 29 defendant's Motion for attorney Michah J. Howe to appear Pro Hac Vice (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2006)
April 27, 2006 40 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 25 28 defendant's Motion for attorney Leslie V. Payne to appear Pro Hac Vice, (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2006)
April 27, 2006 39 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 24 27 defendant's Motion for attorney Michael F. Heim to appear Pro Hac Vice (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2006)
April 27, 2006 38 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 35 30 defendant's Motion for attorney Parker C. Folse III to appear Pro Hac Vice (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2006)
April 27, 2006 37 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 31 34 defendant's Motion for attorney Ian B Crosby to appear Pro Hac Vice (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2006)
April 27, 2006 36 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 33 defendant's Motion for attorney Floyd G Short to appear Pro Hac Vice (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2006)
April 25, 2006 Received Order re 35 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Burst.com, Inc. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2006)
April 25, 2006 35 MOTION for Admission of Attorney Parker C. Folse, III to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Fee $210.00, receipt number 3384819) filed by Burst.com, Inc.. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2006)
April 25, 2006 Received Order re 34 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Burst.com, Inc. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2006)
April 25, 2006 34 MOTION for Admission of Attorney Ian B. Crosby to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Fee $210.00, receipt number 3384817) filed by Burst.com, Inc. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2006)
April 25, 2006 Received Order re 33 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Burst.com, Inc. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2006)
April 25, 2006 33 MOTION for Admission of Attorney Floyd G. Short to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Fee $210.00, receipt number 3384818) filed by Burst.com, Inc.. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2006)
April 25, 2006 32 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Floyd G. Short filed by Burst.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wecker, Bruce) (Filed on 4/25/2006)
April 25, 2006 31 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Ian B. Crosby filed by Burst.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wecker, Bruce) (Filed on 4/25/2006)
April 25, 2006 30 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Parker C. Folse, III filed by Burst.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wecker, Bruce) (Filed on 4/25/2006)
April 21, 2006 Received Order re 29 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Burst.com, Inc. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2006)
April 21, 2006 29 MOTION for Admission of Attorney Micah J. Howe to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Fee $210.00, Receipt Number 3384697) filed by Burst.com, Inc. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2006)
April 21, 2006 Received Order re 28 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Burst.com, Inc. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2006)
April 21, 2006 28 MOTION for Admission of Attorney Leslie V. Payne to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Fee $210.00, Receipt Number 3384698) filed by Burst.com, Inc. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2006)
April 21, 2006 Received Order re 27 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Burst.com, Inc. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2006)
April 21, 2006 27 MOTION for Admission of Attorney Michael F. Heim to appear in Pro Hac Vice filed by Burst.com, Inc. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2006)
April 21, 2006 26 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Micah J. Howe filed by Burst.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wecker, Bruce) (Filed on 4/21/2006)
April 21, 2006 25 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Leslie V. Payne filed by Burst.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wecker, Bruce) (Filed on 4/21/2006)
April 21, 2006 24 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Michael F. Heim filed by Burst.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wecker, Bruce) (Filed on 4/21/2006)
April 17, 2006 23 Certificate of Interested Entities Defendant's Civil Local Rule 3-16 Certification (Wecker, Bruce) (Filed on 4/17/2006)
April 17, 2006 22 Original ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Apple Computer Inc. byBurst.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Wecker, Bruce) (Filed on 4/17/2006)
March 29, 2006 21 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR (mediation); Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 3/29/2006. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2006)
March 28, 2006 20 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b) of discussion of ADR options (Yorio, Robert) (Filed on 3/28/2006)
March 28, 2006 19 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Arbitration by Apple Computer Inc., Burst.com, Inc. (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 3/28/2006)
March 28, 2006 18 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b) of discussion of ADR options (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 3/28/2006)
March 24, 2006 17 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2006)
March 14, 2006 16 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: Case Management Conference reset for 5/8/2006 04:00 PM; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 3/14/2006. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2006)
March 10, 2006 15 Declaration of Nicholas A. Brown in Support of 14 Stipulation TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed byApple Computer Inc.. (Related document(s) 14 ) (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 3/10/2006)
March 10, 2006 14 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Apple Computer Inc., Burst.com, Inc.. (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 3/10/2006)
March 10, 2006 13 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint for Declaratory Judgment by Burst.com, Inc.. (Springer, Colby) (Filed on 3/10/2006)
February 17, 2006 12 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to and including 3/20/06 for defendant to file responsive pleading; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 2/17/2006. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2006)
February 16, 2006 11 STIPULATION To Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint for Declaratory Judgment by Burst.com, Inc.. (Springer, Colby) (Filed on 2/16/2006)
February 3, 2006 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Apple Computer Inc.. Burst.com, Inc. served on 1/6/2006, answer due 1/26/2006. (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 2/3/2006)
January 27, 2006 9 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to and including 2/17/2006 for defendant to file responsive pleading; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 1/27/2006. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2006)
January 26, 2006 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT by Burst.com, Inc.. (Yorio, Robert) (Filed on 1/26/2006)
January 13, 2006 7 CLERK'S NOTICE: Case Management Conference set for 4/3/2006 04:00 PM before the honorable Marilyn Hall Patel; Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/24/2006. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2006)
January 12, 2006 6 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Marilyn H. Patel for all further proceedings. Judge James Larson no longer assigned to case.Signed by Executive Committee on 1/12/06. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2006)
January 11, 2006 5 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (wh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2006)
January 10, 2006 4 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Apple Computer Inc.. (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 1/10/2006)
January 4, 2006 3 Certificate of Interested Entities re 1 Complaint (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/19/2006 (ga, COURT STAFF).
January 4, 2006 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2006)
January 4, 2006 2 Featured Case ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 3/29/2006. Case Management Conference set for 4/5/2006 10:30 AM.. Signed by Judge James Larson on 1/4/06. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2006)
January 4, 2006 1 COMPLAINT /issued summons against Burst.com, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 250, receipt number 5513698.). Filed byApple Computer Inc.. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/19/2006 (ga, COURT STAFF). Additional attachment(s) added on 1/25/2006 (gba, COURT STAFF). Additional attachment(s) added on 1/25/2006 (gba, COURT STAFF). Additional attachment(s) added on 1/25/2006 (gba, COURT STAFF). Additional attachment(s) added on 1/25/2006 (gba, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Apple Computer Inc. v. Burst.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burst.com, Inc.
Represented By: Eric James Enger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: Burst.com, Inc.
Represented By: Ian B. Crosby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Ian B. Crosby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Burst.com, Inc.
Represented By: Ian B. Crosby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Ian B. Crosby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?