Cross et al v. G.D. Searle LLC et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv00087
Filed: January 9, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 22, 2010 77 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/22/10. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2010)
February 5, 2010 74 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Judith Hubble terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/3/10. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2010)
January 11, 2010 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/8/10. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2010)
January 7, 2010 69 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; Hazel Dempsey, James Elliott, Jr, Nancy Eschbach, James Estrada, Norma Guenther, Ellen Hoskin, Mary Jennings, Nydia McClure, Ronald Prewitt, Margaret Sanchez, Jerry Sederes, Sr, Karla Siekmann, Brady Sims, Dennis Turner, Terry Williams, Daniel Wohlgemuth, Michael Bukowsky and Ronald Burston terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/4/10. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2010)
December 18, 2009 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/18/2009. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2009)
December 17, 2009 67 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. John Sousan terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/11/09. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2009)
October 1, 2009 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Martha Taylor terminated.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/25/09. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2009)
September 29, 2009 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: JOHN SOUSAN. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/29/2009. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2009)
September 22, 2009 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: JUDITH HUBBLE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/22/2009. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cross et al v. G.D. Searle LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?