Rice et al v. Pfizer, Inc. et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv00089
Filed: January 9, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 28, 2010 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (Karen Mullanix C 06-0089 CRB; Harry Lambert C 06-0723 CRB; Norvill Adkins C 06-1879 CRB; Direl Fyffe C 06-1879 CRB; Dubard Howard C 06-1879 CRB; Della Howard C 06-1879 CRB; Otto Ramos Morales C 06-2438 CRB; Teri Deb nam C 06-2484 CRB; Sybil Carter C 06-3528; Crystal Dixon C 06-3528; Priscilla Labeaud C 06-3528; Sofya Prilutskaya C 06-3528; Debra Scroggins C 06-3528; Vivian Schultz C 06-6548 CRB; Juanice Powers C 07-0288 CRB; Anita McDonald C 07-0403 CRB; Olivett e Woods C 07-0403 CRB; Larry Haymore C 07-1095; Esfir Klebanova C 07-2212 CRB; Shandra Pearce C 07-3062 CRB; Donald Clark C 07-3211 CRB; Lora Mason C 07-3211 CRB; Anush Bagramyan C 07-4799 CRB). Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 09/27/2010. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2010)
September 27, 2010 11 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO CERTAIN PLAINTIFFS IN 06-89. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 09/27/10. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2010)
September 2, 2010 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on September 1, 2010. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2010)
February 5, 2010 6 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Cheryl Rice terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/3/10. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rice et al v. Pfizer, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?