Pickard v. Department of Justice

Case Number: 3:2006cv00185
Filed: January 11, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 05:552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 15, 2016 268 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 260 Second Motion for De Novo Review and Holding that Government May Withhold Materials. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2016)
August 8, 2016 259 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting in part and denying in part 256 Motion for Leave to File a Reply and to Reschedule Hearing. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2016)
July 29, 2016 255 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TERMINATING MOTION, VACATING HEARING, DIRECTING FILING OF NEW BRIEFS, AND SETTING NEW HEARING DATE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/29/2016. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2016)
July 6, 2016 254 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING REQUEST FOR MORE INFORMATION. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/6/2016. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2016)
June 28, 2016 252 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUESTING ADDITIONAL INFORMATION FROM GOVERNMENT. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/28/2016. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2016)
June 23, 2016 251 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: DOCUMENTS FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW. The DEA is ordered to retrieve the documents from Chambers on the 4th Floor, 280 S. First Street, San Jose, by 12:00 PM on 6/24/2016. Pickup may be coordinated with the Courtroom Deputy at 408.535.5343. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 6/23/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2016)
May 2, 2016 243 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO RELEASE DOCUMENTS FOLLOWING IN CAMERA REVIEW. Re: Dkt. No. 227 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 5/2/2016. (lhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2016)
February 1, 2016 232 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AS MODIFIED GRANTING STIPLATION TO EXTEND TIME 231 . Status Report due by 3/2/2016. Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 3/16/2016 11:00 AM. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 2/1/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2016)
December 24, 2015 227 Opinion or Order of the Court TENTATIVE RULING ORDERING RELEASE OF DOCUMENTS FOLLOWING IN CAMERA REVIEW. Re: Dkt. No. 198 . Telephonic case management conference set for 1/20/2016 11:00 AM in San Jose. Both parties to file status reports by 1/13/2016. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 12/24/2015. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2015)
November 16, 2015 224 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER IN RESPONSE TO LETTER FROM PICKARD'S COUNSEL NOVEMBER 16, 2015. Re: Dkt. No. 223 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 11/16/2015. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2015)
August 27, 2015 222 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer DENYING 220 Motion for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2015)
August 4, 2015 221 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: VAUGHN INDEXED DOCUMENTS FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW. The DEA may retrieve the documents and must make arrangements with the Courtroom Deputy Lili Harrell at 408.535.5343. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 8/4/2015. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2015)
July 20, 2015 219 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FINDING VAUGHN INDEX SUFFICIENT Re: Dkt. No. 217 Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 7/20/2015. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2015)
February 19, 2015 210 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON SUFFICIENCY OF VAUGHN INDEX Re: Dkt. Nos. 207 208 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 2/19/2015. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2015)
May 7, 2014 198 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 184 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 188 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2014)
January 17, 2014 187 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 186 STIPULATION Requesting Modification of Briefing Schedule filed by William Leonard Pickard. Reset Deadlines as to 184 MOTION for Summary Judgment , Responses due by 1/28/2014. Replies due by 2/18/2014. Motion Hearing set for 4/4/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Cross Motions due by 1/28/2014. Response dlue 2/18/2014. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/17/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2014)
November 1, 2013 183 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 182 STIPULATION on Summary Judgment Briefing filed by William Leonard Pickard. Motions due by 1/7/2014. Responses due by 1/21/2014; Cross Motions due by 1/21/2014. Opposition/Replies due by 2/11/2014. Motion Hearing set for 3/28/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/31/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2013)
September 13, 2013 179 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte denying 173 Motion To Lift Stay (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2013)
June 19, 2013 169 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 168 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Requesting Case Management Conference filed by William Leonard Pickard. Case Management Conference set for 7/12/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/17/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2013)
July 13, 2012 160 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re briefing schedule re 159 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE SUMMARY JUDGMENT BRIEFING SCHEDULE filed by Department of Justice. Reset Deadlines as to 140 Third MOTION for Summary Judgment , 152 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Third Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendant's Reply brief and Responses due by 7/23/2012. Replies due by 8/20/2012. Motion Hearing reset for 9/28/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/12/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2012)
June 20, 2012 158 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 157 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE SUMMARY JUDGMENT BRIEFING SCHEDULE filed by Department of Justice.Reset Deadlines as to 152 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Third Motion for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 7/13/2012. Replies due by 7/30/2012. Cross-Motions for SJ Hearing reset for 8/31/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/20/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012)
May 2, 2012 151 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re SJ hearing date re 150 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Summary Judgment Hearing Date filed by Department of Justice. Reset Deadlines as to 140 Third MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion Hearing reset for 8/17/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/1/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2012)
April 26, 2012 149 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 147 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule filed by William Leonard Pickard. Hearing set for 7/13/2012 is vacated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/25/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2012)
March 2, 2012 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 138 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING SUMMARY JUDGMENT BRIEFING SCHEDULE Motions due by 3/30/2012. Responses due by 4/30/2012. Replies due by 5/30/2012. Motion Hearing set for 7/13/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/1/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pickard v. Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?