Jensen Enterprises, Inc. v. AT&T, Inc. et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv00247
Filed: January 12, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 7, 2010 570 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LIMITED RELIEF FROM PROTECTIVE ORDER (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2010)
August 13, 2010 557 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 555 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
August 28, 2009 528 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: SUPERSEDEAS BOND (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2009)
April 20, 2009 509 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S RULE 59(e) MOTION TO ALTER OR AMEND re 489 .(COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2009)
March 2, 2009 488 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Defendants' motions for summary judgment have been granted. Judgment is entered accordingly. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2009)
February 23, 2009 487 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; DENYING ALL OTHER MOTIONS AS MOOT 355 , 346 , 349 , 358 .(SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2009)
February 5, 2009 485 Opinion or Order of the Court CORRECTED SCHEDULING ORDER (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2009)
September 4, 2008 466 Opinion or Order of the Court CORRECT ORDER SETTING NEW TRIAL SCHEDULE (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2008)
September 2, 2008 465 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing pretrial to 3/3/09 and trial to 3/16/09. Signed by Judge Illston on 8/29/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jensen Enterprises, Inc. v. AT&T, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?