Fosselman v. Gibbs et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv00375
Filed: January 20, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 5, 2012 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER requiring supplemental declaration from Plaintiff re 132 Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on October 5, 2012. (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2012)
September 26, 2012 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 134 Proposed Order filed by C. Kates, Allison Brager, Charles Dudley Lee Continuing Hearing Date to October 30, 2012. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 9/26/12. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2012)
December 31, 2008 70 Opinion or Order of the Court Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding; case did not settle. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 12/31/08. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/31/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fosselman v. Gibbs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?