Ibrahim v. Department of Homeland et al

Case Number: 3:2006cv00545
Filed: January 27, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 7, 2014 811 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RESOLVING REMAINING ISSUES. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 7, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2014)
October 31, 2014 806 Opinion or Order of the Court REQUEST FOR BRIEFING. Responses due November 7 at noon.. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 31, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2014)
October 9, 2014 803 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RESOLVING OBJECTIONS, ADOPTING SPECIAL MASTERS REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, VACATING HEARING, AND FIXING COMPENSATION re 787 , 789 Reports.. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 9, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2014)
September 24, 2014 790 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 789 Report, 787 Report. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 24, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2014)
September 19, 2014 788 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE DOCKET NUMBER 756-10. Report due September 26 at noon.. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 19, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2014)
August 23, 2014 786 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION by Hon. William Alsup re 783 Motion for Leave to File.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2014)
August 13, 2014 784 Opinion or Order of the Court REQUEST RE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION (DKT. NO. 783). Response due August 20 at noon.. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 13, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2014)
July 11, 2014 775 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPOINTING GINA MOON AS SPECIAL MASTER re 739 , 740 , 748 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees and Expenses. Report and recommendation due September 18, 2014 at noon.. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 11, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2014)
July 9, 2014 773 Opinion or Order of the Court REQUEST RE APPOINTMENT OF SPECIAL MASTER. Response due July 11 at noon. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 9, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2014)
June 26, 2014 771 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE SPECIAL MASTER. Response due July 9 at noon.. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 26, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2014)
June 16, 2014 766 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE RESPONSE TO SECOND MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Response due June 20 at noon.. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 16, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2014)
June 2, 2014 758 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE NON-COMPLIANT DECLARATIONS. Responses due June 9 at noon.. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 2, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2014)
May 1, 2014 755 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE STATEMENT OF SERVICE COSTS TO BE TAXED re 741 Order, 754 Statement. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 1, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2014)
April 18, 2014 743 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Response due by noon on 04/23/2014.. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 18, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2014)
April 16, 2014 741 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE REVIEW OF CLERKS BILL OF COSTS by Judge Alsup re 717 Motion (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2014)
March 25, 2014 730 Opinion or Order of the Court REQUEST RE MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND EXPENSES. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 25, 2014. Response due noon on March 28. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2014)
March 17, 2014 727 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING HEARING TO MARCH 25 AND VACATING HEARING Motion Hearing set for 3/25/2014 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 17, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2014)
March 14, 2014 723 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE by Hon. William Alsup re 722 Motion to Strike 720 Supplemental Brief, 722 MOTION to Strike 720 Supplemental Brief, 721 Declaration in Support, , 721 Declaration in Support,.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2014)
March 6, 2014 718 Opinion or Order of the Court REQUEST REGARDING ENTITLEMENT TO FEES AND COSTS re 709 Declaration in Support,, filed by Tom Ridge, National Counterterrorism Center, Eric H. Holder, Jr., Department of State, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Janet Napolitano, Hilary Clinton, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Michael E. Leiter, Michael Chertoff, Department of Homeland Security, Terrorist Screening Center, Leonard C. Boyle, Robert Mueller, Donna A. Bucella, 699 Declaration in Support, filed by Rahinah Ibrahim. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 6, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014)
February 26, 2014 715 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STRIKING REPLY DECLARATION AND EXHIBITS re 712 Declaration in Support, filed by Rahinah Ibrahim, 714 Objection,, filed by Tom Ridge, National Counterterrorism Center, Eric H. Holder, Jr., Department of State, Arthur M. Cumming s, II, Janet Napolitano, Hilary Clinton, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Michael E. Leiter, Michael Chertoff, Department of Homeland Security, Terrorist Screening Center, Leonard C. Boyle, Robert Mueller, Donna A. Bucella. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 26, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2014)
February 3, 2014 700 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING FINDINGS OF FACT, CONCLUSIONS OF LAW, AND ORDER FOR RELIEF. Response due February 6.. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 3, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
January 21, 2014 686 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING FILINGS. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 21, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
January 15, 2014 685 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE FILING PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 15, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2014)
January 14, 2014 684 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 14, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2014)
December 30, 2013 674 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ORDER RE ACCESS TO CLASSIFIED DOCUMENTS re 669 Response ( Non Motion ) filed by Rahinah Ibrahim, 665 Notice (Other) filed by Rahinah Ibrahim. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 30, 2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2013)
December 23, 2013 668 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING JANUARY 2 AND 9 HEARINGS. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 23, 2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2013)
December 18, 2013 666 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE CLEARANCE. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 18, 2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2013)
December 10, 2013 661 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE RE PLAINTIFFS DAUGHTER re 658 Notice (Other) filed by Rahinah Ibrahim. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 10, 2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2013)
December 7, 2013 657 Opinion or Order of the Court REQUEST FOR SUBMISSIONS RE SSI VERSUS SECRET STANDARDS. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 7, 2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2013)
December 6, 2013 652 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING FORMAT OF PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW AFTER BENCH TRIAL. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 6, 2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2013)
December 5, 2013 647 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE HEARSAY AND LEADING OBJECTIONS RE TX 30 AND ASSOCIATED QUESTIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 5, 2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2013)
December 1, 2013 632 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 1, 2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2013)
November 29, 2013 627 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND ORDER RE EXPERT DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/29/2013. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2013)
November 27, 2013 625 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE BRIEFING EXPERT DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 27, 2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2013)
November 15, 2013 616 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER, Motions terminated: 604 MOTION in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Proferred Expert Testimony filed by Tom Ridge, National Counterterrorism Center, Eric H. Holder, Jr., Department of State, Arthur M. Cummings, II, J anet Napolitano, Hilary Clinton, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Michael E. Leiter, Michael Chertoff, Department of Homeland Security, Terrorist Screening Center, Leonard C. Boyle, Robert Mueller, Donna A. Bucella, 595 MOTION in Limin e Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Witnesses Not Permitted to be Deposed by Plaintiff filed by Rahinah Ibrahim, 606 MOTION in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Proffered Exhibits filed by Tom Ridge, National Counterterr orism Center, Eric H. Holder, Jr., Department of State, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Janet Napolitano, Hilary Clinton, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Michael E. Leiter, Michael Chertoff, Department of Homeland Security, Terrorist Screening Ce nter, Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Robert Mueller, 605 MOTION in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Proffered Fact Witnesses filed by Tom Ridge, National Counterterrorism Center, Eric H. Holder, Jr., Department of State, Arthur M. Cummi ngs, II, Janet Napolitano, Hilary Clinton, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Michael E. Leiter, Michael Chertoff, Department of Homeland Security, Terrorist Screening Center, Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Robert Mueller, 594 MOTIO N in Limine Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Evidence Submitted Ex Parte by Defendants and Not Ordered Produced to Plaintiff filed by Rahinah Ibrahim.. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 15, 2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2013)
November 14, 2013 613 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE CLASSIFIED EXHIBIT AND BRIEF ON PUBLIC ACCESS re 609 Brief, filed by Tom Ridge, National Counterterrorism Center, Eric H. Holder, Jr., Arthur M. Cummings, II, Janet Napolitano, Hilary Clinton, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Michael E. Leiter, Michael Chertoff, Terrorist Screening Center, Leonard C. Boyle, Robert Mueller, Donna A. Bucella, 602 Trial Brief, filed by Tom Ridge, National Counterterrorism Center, Eric H. Holder, Jr., Department of State, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Janet Napolitano, Hilary Clinton, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Michael E. Leiter, Michael Chertoff, Department of Homeland Security, Terrorist Screening Center, Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella, Robert Mueller. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 14, 2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2013)
October 30, 2013 586 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE SUMMARY JUDGMENT HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 30, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2013)
October 29, 2013 585 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE REQUEST FOR EXTENSION. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 29, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2013)
October 24, 2013 580 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE EXPERT DISCOVERY DISPUTES re 552 Letter Brief, filed by Tom Ridge, National Counterterrorism Center, Eric H. Holder, Jr., Department of State, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Janet Napolitano, Hilary Clinton, Federal Bureau of Inve stigation, Michael E. Leiter, Michael Chertoff, Department of Homeland Security, Terrorist Screening Center, Leonard C. Boyle, Robert Mueller, Donna A. Bucella, 576 Status Report Order. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 24, 2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2013)
October 21, 2013 574 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE (CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER): Bench Trial set for 12/2/2013 07:30 AM before Hon. William Alsup. Pretrial Conference set for 11/15/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 21, 2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2013)
October 17, 2013 571 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER LIFTING STAY AND REQUESTING SUBMISSIONS RE SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND TRIAL DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 17, 2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2013)
October 8, 2013 569 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PRETRIAL DEADLINES by Hon. William Alsup granting 553 Motion to Continue.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2013)
October 2, 2013 561 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE SERVICE LIST. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 2, 2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2013)
October 1, 2013 559 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE ADMINISTRATIVE ISSUES by Judge Alsup deferring ruling on 553 Motion to Continue; granting in part and denying in part 554 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
September 27, 2013 551 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE SEALED DOCUMENT re 548 Order,. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 27, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2013)
September 26, 2013 548 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF UNCLASSIFIED DOCUMENTS (DKT. NO. 515) (REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION) re 515 Discovery Letter BriefREDACTED filed by Rahinah Ibrahim. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 26, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2013)
September 13, 2013 540 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE WITHHELD DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 13, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2013)
September 11, 2013 538 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON THREE DISCOVERY MOTIONS (DKT. NOS. 517-18, 521) by Judge Alsup denying 517 Discovery Letter Brief; denying 518 Discovery Letter Brief; denying 521 Discovery Letter Brief (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2013)
September 6, 2013 536 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE MOTION TO COMPEL (DKT. NO. 515). Signed by Judge Alsup on September 6, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2013)
August 23, 2013 532 Opinion or Order of the Court OMNIBUS ORDER ON PENDING MOTIONS by Judge Alsup denying 494 Discovery Letter Brief; denying 499 Motion for Leave to File; granting in part and denying in part 506 Motion to Continue; granting in part and denying in part 515 Discovery Letter Brief (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2013)
August 5, 2013 516 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUESTING RESPONSE TO DISCOVERY LETTER re 515 Discovery Letter BriefREDACTED filed by Rahinah Ibrahim. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 5, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2013)
July 31, 2013 513 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO REMOVE INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENT FROM DOCKET by Hon. William Alsup granting 510 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2013)
July 23, 2013 505 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR HEARING by Hon. William Alsup denying 503 Motion for Hearing.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2013)
July 2, 2013 497 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE DEPOSITION OATH re 493 Letter filed by Rahinah Ibrahim. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 2, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2013)
July 1, 2013 495 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE DISPUTE OVER DEPOSITION OATH re 493 Letter filed by Rahinah Ibrahim. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 1, 2013.. (whalc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2013)
June 13, 2013 487 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE MOTIONS FOR RECONSIDERATION re 486 Letter filed by Rahinah Ibrahim, 485 Letter filed by Rahinah Ibrahim. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 13, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2013)
June 4, 2013 484 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE DEPOSITIONS by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 482 Discovery Letter Brief.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013)
May 23, 2013 481 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO QUASH re 480 Letter filed by Rahinah Ibrahim, 477 Letter Brief, filed by Tom Ridge, National Counterterrorism Center, Eric H. Holder, Jr., Department of State, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Janet Napolitano, Hila ry Clinton, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Michael E. Leiter, Michael Chertoff, Terrorist Screening Center, Department of Homeland Security, Leonard C. Boyle, Robert Mueller. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 23, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2013)
May 20, 2013 478 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE MOTION TO QUASH re 477 Letter Brief, filed by Tom Ridge, National Counterterrorism Center, Eric H. Holder, Jr., Department of State, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Janet Napolitano, Hilary Clinton, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Michael E. Leiter, Michael Chertoff, Terrorist Screening Center, Department of Homeland Security, Leonard C. Boyle, Robert Mueller. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 20, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2013)
April 23, 2013 470 Opinion or Order of the Court REQUEST REGARDING SSI CLEARANCES re 466 Response ( Non Motion ), filed by Tom Ridge, National Counterterrorism Center, Eric H. Holder, Jr., Department of State, Janet Napolitano, Hilary Clinton, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Michael E. Leiter, Michael Chertoff, Terrorist Screening Center, Department of Homeland Security, Leonard C. Boyle, Donna A. Bucella. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 22, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2013)
April 19, 2013 465 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING SEALED SUBMISSIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 19, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2013)
April 5, 2013 455 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING NON-SENSITIVE SECURITY INFORMATION re 453 Proposed Order filed by Rahinah Ibrahim. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 4, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2013)
March 28, 2013 450 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING IN CAMERA SUBMISSIONS OF WITHHELD DOCUMENTS re 425 MOTION to Compel FURTHER RESPONSES TO WRITTEN DISCOVERY AND TO COMPEL RULE 30(b)(6) DEPOSITIONS filed by Rahinah Ibrahim. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 28, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2013)
March 25, 2013 446 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SEAL by Hon. William Alsup granting 443 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2013)
March 20, 2013 441 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CHANGING SCHEDULE re 437 Order on Discovery Letter Brief,, Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,,. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 20, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2013)
March 13, 2013 437 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING NON-SSI PRIVILEGE LOG, MOTION TO SEAL, REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME, AND CLASSIFIED SUBMISSIONS by Judge Alsup terminating 405 Discovery Letter Brief; terminating 406 Discovery Letter Brief; granting 423 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 433 Motion (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2013)
March 8, 2013 436 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING GOVERNMENT SUBMISSIONS re 431 Notice (Other), filed by Tom Ridge, National Counterterrorism Center, Eric H. Holder, Jr., Department of State, Janet Napolitano, Hilary Clinton, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Michael E. Leiter, Michael Chertoff, Department of Homeland Security, Terrorist Screening Center, Leonard C. Boyle, Robert Mueller, Donna A. Bucella (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2013)
February 25, 2013 420 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DISCOVERY REQUESTS re 418 Letter Brief filed by Rahinah Ibrahim (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2013)
February 19, 2013 416 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING PRIVILEGE LOGS FOR NON-CLASSIFIED DOCUMENTS re 415 Letter filed by Rahinah Ibrahim, 407 Order,, 413 Letter Brief, filed by Tom Ridge, National Counterterrorism Center, Eric H. Holder, Jr., Department of State, Janet N apolitano, Hilary Clinton, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Michael E. Leiter, Michael Chertoff, Department of Homeland Security, Terrorist Screening Center, Leonard C. Boyle, Robert Mueller, Donna A. Bucella (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2013)
February 15, 2013 414 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING PRIVILEGE LOG re 412 Response ( Non Motion ), filed by Tom Ridge, National Counterterrorism Center, Eric H. Holder, Jr., Department of State, Janet Napolitano, Hilary Clinton, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Michael E. Leiter, Michael Chertoff, Department of Homeland Security, Terrorist Screening Center, Leonard C. Boyle, Robert Mueller, Donna A. Bucella, 410 Response ( Non Motion ) filed by Rahinah Ibrahim (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2013)
February 13, 2013 409 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR CLARIFICATION re 408 Notice (Other), filed by Tom Ridge, National Counterterrorism Center, Eric H. Holder, Jr., Department of State, Janet Napolitano, Hilary Clinton, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Michael E. Leiter, Michael Chertoff, Department of Homeland Security, Terrorist Screening Center, Leonard C. Boyle, Robert Mueller, Donna A. Bucella, 407 Order,, (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2013)
February 7, 2013 407 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING PRIVILEGE LOG AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 405 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Rahinah Ibrahim, 406 Discovery Letter BriefRegarding Proposal for Eliminating/Limiting Discovery Disputes filed by Tom Ridge, Nati onal Counterterrorism Center, Eric H. Holder, Jr., Department of State, Janet Napolitano, Hilary Clinton, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Michael E. Leiter, Michael Chertoff, Department of Homeland Security, Terrorist Screening Center, Leonard C. Boyle, Robert Mueller, Donna A. Bucella (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2013)
December 20, 2012 399 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY by Judge William Alsup [denying 373 Motion to Dismiss; denying 375 Discovery Letter Brief]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2012)
November 20, 2012 381 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUESTING RESPONSE [re 375 Discovery Letter Brief Requesting Stay of Discovery Pending Resolution of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Tom Ridge, National Counterterrorism Center, Eric H. Holder, Jr., Department of St ate, Arthur M. Cummings, II, Janet Napolitano, Hilary Clinton, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Michael E. Leiter, Michael Chertoff, Department of Homeland Security, Terrorist Screening Center, Leonard C. Boyle, Robert Mueller, Donna A. Bucella] Response due by noon on 12/3/2012. Discovery Hearing set for 12/20/2012 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/20/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2012)
November 8, 2012 377 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE RE EX PARTE DISCLOSURES. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 8, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2012)
November 7, 2012 372 Opinion or Order of the Court REQUEST FOR BRIEFING MEMORANDA. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 7, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2012)
October 11, 2012 365 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER ON REMAND. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 11, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2012)
August 3, 2012 359 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 358 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/26/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2012)
March 21, 2012 351 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING BILL OF COSTS [re 348 Bill of Costs filed by Rahinah Ibrahim]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/21/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2012)
March 15, 2010 328 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 68. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 15, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2010)
March 11, 2010 326 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING RULE 68 OFFER OF JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 11, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2010)
January 13, 2010 312 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING SENSITIVE SECURITY INFORMATION. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 13, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2010)
January 8, 2010 311 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING OBJECTIONS TO PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 8, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2010)
January 6, 2010 307 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING SECURITY SCREENING OF COURT PERSONNEL. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 6, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2010)
December 24, 2009 288 Opinion or Order of the Court CLARIFICATION OF ORDER DATED DECEMBER 17, 2009 [re 287 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) filed by John Cunningham, Elizabeth Maron, Richard Pate, City and County of San Francisco]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 12/24/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2009)
December 17, 2009 285 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR PRODUCTION OF ITEMS DESPITE THE ASSERTION OF VARIOUS PRIVILEGES [re 238 Brief, filed by City and County of San Francisco, 250 MOTION to Seal and for in camera review filed by Transportation Security Administration, Federal Bureau of Inv estigation, 236 Settlement Conference, Set Hearings, 275 Objection filed by Rahinah Ibrahim, 231 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Answers to Interrogatories as to the Federal Defendants; Request for Continuance of Fact Discovery Cutoff and Expert Disclosure Deadline filed by Rahinah Ibrahim]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 12/17/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2009)
December 2, 2009 278 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING NON-PARTIES' SECOND ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL AN EX PARTE, IN CAMERA CLASSIFIED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF THE ASSERTION OF LAW ENFORCEMENT PRIVILEGE [re 277 MOTION to Seal Document 265 Notice (Other), Notice (Oth er), 263 Order Non-Parties' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal An Ex Parte, In Camera Classified Declaration in Support of the Assertion of the Law Enforcement Privilege MOTION to Seal Document 265 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), 263 Order Non-Parties' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal An Ex Parte, In Camera Classified Declaration in Support of the Assertion of the Law Enforcement Privilege filed by Department of Homeland Security, Terrorist Screening Center, Federal Bureau of Investigation]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 12/2/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2009)
November 19, 2009 263 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/19/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2009)
November 18, 2009 260 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 259 SAN FRANCISCO DEFENDANTS' REQUEST TO MODIFY THE COURT'S ORDER OF NOVEMBER 18, 2009 [re 258 Order]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/18/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2009) Modified on 11/19/2009 (sis, COURT STAFF).
November 17, 2009 255 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE NON-PARTIES' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL AND IN CAMERA AND CHANGING DEADLINES [re 250 MOTION to Seal and for in camera review filed by Transportation Security Administration, Federal Bureau of Investigation]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/17/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2009)
November 13, 2009 248 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CHANGING HEARING DATE AND RESPONDING TO NON-PARTIES' LETTER RE MOTION TO QUASH [re 245 Letter, filed by Department of Homeland Security, Donna A. Bucella, Department of State, Transportation Security Administration, Federal Bureau of Investigation]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/13/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2009)
November 4, 2009 230 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' DISCOVERY DISPUTE [Friday, November 6, 2009, at 2:30 pm]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/3/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2009)
October 30, 2009 225 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 219 Proposed Order filed by John Bondanella, US Investigations Services, Inc. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 10/30/09. (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2009)
October 28, 2009 221 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING HEARING RE PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re 220 Letter filed by Rahinah Ibrahim]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/28/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2009)
October 1, 2009 213 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 1, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2009)
April 3, 2009 162 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 157 Case Management Scheduling Order, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Settlement, Order Lifting Stay,,, 156 Case Management Conference - Initial, Case Referred to Magistrate Judge for Settlement Conference, Set Hearings,,, Settlement Conference set for 4/3/2009 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 4/3/09. (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2009)
April 1, 2009 159 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 1, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2009)
March 12, 2009 157 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James for Mediation/Settlement. ORDER LIFTING STAY. Discovery due by 11/30/2009. Jury Trial set for 4/12/2010 07:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motions due by 1/7/2010. Pretrial Conference set for 3/29/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/12/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2009)
February 11, 2009 152 Opinion or Order of the Court DISREGARD DOCUMENT. FILED IN ERROR. Modified on 2/11/2009 (whasec, COURT STAFF).
February 9, 2009 151 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO MARCH 12, 2009, AT 3:00 P.M. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 2/9/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2009)
December 29, 2008 148 Opinion or Order of the Court USCA MANDATE - Judgment entered 08/18/08 takes effect this date re 114 Notice of Appeal (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2008)
December 11, 2008 147 Opinion or Order of the Court USCA ORDER - PetitionS for rehearing are denied. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2008) (sis, COURT STAFF).
September 17, 2008 144 Opinion or Order of the Court USCA ORDER - Federal Appellees' motion for extension of time to file a petition for rehearing is granted. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2008)
September 4, 2008 141 Opinion or Order of the Court STANDING ORDER FOR ALL JUDGES OF THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2008)
January 27, 2006 3 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 2 ADR Scheduling Order (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2006)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ibrahim v. Department of Homeland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?