Advanced Analogic Technologies, Inc. v. Linear Technology Corporation

Case Number: 3:2006cv00735
Filed: February 2, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 4, 2011 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: STIPULATED MOTION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Granting 81 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2011)
December 30, 2009 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE JOINT STATUS STATEMENT. The parties are directed to file, no later than June 30, 2010, and every six months thereafter, a joint statement advising the Court of the status of the proceedings before the ITC. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 30, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2009)
May 1, 2009 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE JOINT STATUS STATEMENT. The parties are directed to file, no later than December 1, 2009, a joint statement advising the Court of the status of the appeals to the Federal Circuit and the proceedings before the ITC. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 1, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2009)
December 3, 2008 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE JOINT STATUS STATEMENT. The parties are directed to file, no later than April 30, 2009, a joint statement advising the Court of the status of the parties' appeals to the Federal Circuit of determinations made by the ITC in Investigation Number 337-TA-564. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 3, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Advanced Analogic Technologies, Inc. v. Linear Technology Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?